Franklin American Mortgage Corporation v. First Educators Credit Union
Plaintiff: Franklin American Mortgage Corporation
Defendant: First Educators Credit Union
Case Number: 3:2011cv00749
Filed: August 5, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Office: Nashville Office
County: Williamson
Presiding Judge: John S. Bryant
Presiding Judge: Todd J. Campbell
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 186 ORDER granting 185 Motion for Leave to File a Reply Memorandum. Signed by District Judge Todd J. Campbell on 12/17/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
October 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 160 JUDGMENT in favor of Franklin American Mortgage Corporation against First Educators Credit Union. Signed by Deputy Clerk Doris E. Bush on 10/31/2013. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(hb)
October 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER granting 137 Motion for Leave to file Reply brief. Signed by District Judge Todd J. Campbell on 10/21/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(la)
October 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 133 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: granting in part and denying in part 67 Motion in Limine. Signed by Magistrate Judge John S. Bryant on 10/15/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
October 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER: Pretrial Conference is reset for 10/25/2013 at 3:00 PM before District Judge Todd J. Campbell. Signed by District Judge Todd J. Campbell on 10/11/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
October 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER: Pending before the Court, among other things, are Defendant's Motion for Leave to File Motion in Limine 89 , Defendant's Motion for Leave to File a Reply Memorandum 116 , and Defendant's Motion for Leave to File a Reply Memor andum 117 . These Motions are GRANTED, and the Clerk is directed to file the Motion and Memo attached to Docket No. 89 , the Reply Memorandum attached to Docket No. 116 , and the Reply Memorandum attached to Docket No. 117 . Signed by District Judge Todd J. Campbell on 10/9/13. (dt)
August 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 120 AGREED ORDER: IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the Court shall enter judgment in favor of Franklin and against First Educators in the total amount of $79,567.34, which represents Franklin's actual damages arising from the Cole and Shields M ortgage Loans only, plus reasonable costs, attorneys' fees, and pre-judgment interest arising from the Cole and Shields Mortgage Loans to be determined by the Court. The judgment shall foreclose and preclude any claims Franklin may have agai nst First Educators with respect to the Cole and Shields Mortgage Loans, excluding reasonable costs, attorneys' fees, and pre-judgment interest. Franklin's claim regarding the Crandle Mortgage Loan is dismissed. The four (4) motions in limine (Docket Nos. 67 , 81 , 83 , and 85 ), motion for leave to file a sixth motion in limine (Docket No. 89 ), and motion for leave to file reply memoranda in support of two (2) motions in limine (Docket No. 116 , and 117 ) are pendin g for disposition. Nothing in this Order precludes the claims Franklin has against First Educators with respect to the Mortgage Loans identified in the Complaint as the Rodriguez Mortgage Loan or the Wolf Mortgage Loan. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Todd J. Campbell on 8/1/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(la)
June 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER: Pending before the Court is Defendant's Motion in Limine to Exclude Plaintiff's New Undisclosed Theory and Related Argument, Evidence and Testimony 67 . The Motion is brought pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 37 and involves discovery and Rule 26 disclosures. Accordingly, the Motion is referred to the Magistrate Judge for decision. Signed by District Judge Todd J. Campbell on 6/17/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(la)
April 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER: For the reasons stated in the accompanying Memorandum, Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment 28 is GRANTED, Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment 34 is DENIED, and Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Inadmiss ible Evidence 45 is moot. Plaintiff's claims for failing to repurchase the subject loans are DISMISSED. This action remains set for a jury trial on 7/23/2013. Signed by District Judge Todd J. Campbell on 4/25/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
April 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER granting 61 Motion for Leave to File Substitute Exhibits to 28 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge Todd J. Campbell on 4/16/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
April 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER granting 50 Motion for Leave to File Reply in Excess of Page Limit. Signed by District Judge Todd J. Campbell on 4/9/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
September 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER: Jury Trial set for 7/23/2013 at 9:00 AM before District Judge Todd J. Campbell. Pretrial Conference set for 7/15/2013 at 9:00 AM before District Judge Todd J. Campbell. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 7/8/2013. Exhibit List and Witness List due by 7/8/2013. Signed by District Judge Todd J. Campbell on 9/13/12. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (dt)
September 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 25 AGREED ORDER TO AMEND ORDER AMENDING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Discovery due by 12/14/2012. Dispositive Motions due by 2/28/2013. (SEE ORDER FOR OTHER DEADLINES). Signed by Magistrate Judge John S. Bryant on 9/7/12. (dt)
June 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 22 AGREED ORDER granting 21 Joint MOTION to Amend 15 Initial Case Management Order. Discovery deadline reset for 9/17/2012. Dispositive Motions deadline reset for 2/1/2013. (SEE ORDER FOR OTHER DEADLINES) Signed by Magistrate Judge John S. Bryant on 6/12/12. (dt)
May 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 20 AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge John S. Bryant on 5/16/12. (dt)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Franklin American Mortgage Corporation v. First Educators Credit Union
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Franklin American Mortgage Corporation
Represented By: Charles M. Cain, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Educators Credit Union
Represented By: Derek W. Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?