Teats v. Johnson et al
Plaintiff: Jerome M. Teats
Defendant: Tennessee Department of Corrections, Victor S. Johnson, III, J. Carson Drumwright, Rachel Sobrero, J. Randall Wyatt, Jr., David D. Torrence, Michie F. Gibson, Jr., John-Jane Doe, Davidson County, Gayle Ray, District Attorneys and Department of Corrections
Case Number: 3:2011cv00753
Filed: August 5, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Office: Nashville Office
County: Davidson
Presiding Judge: John S. Bryant
Presiding Judge: Todd J. Campbell
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER: The Magistrate Judge's 111 , 112 Reports and Recommendations are adopted and approved, and pltf's claims against defts Torrence, Johnson, Drumwright, Sobrero, Ray and Tennessee Department of Corrections are DISMISSED. The Magistra te Judge's 113 Report and Recommendation is approved in part and rejected in part. Pltf's Section 1983 claim against deft Metro is time-barred; the Court declines to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over the state law claims, and they a re dismissed without prejudice; and pltf's claims against deft Metro are DISMISSED. All defts having now been dismissed, the Clerk is directed to close this file. Any other pending Motions are denied as moot. This Order shall constitute the final judgment in this case. Signed by District Judge Todd J. Campbell on 9/26/12. (xc:Pro se party by regular and certified mail.)(DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(rd)
August 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER: Pending before the Court are a Report and Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge (Docket No. 101), Plaintiff's Objections thereto (Docket No. 109), and Defendant Wyatts Response to Plaintiffs Objections (Docket No. 115). Pursuant to 28 U .S.C. § 636(b)(1), Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(b)(3) and Local Rule 72.03(b)(3), the Court has reviewed de novo the Report and Recommendation, the Objections, the Response, and the file. The Objections of the Plaintiff are overruled, and the Report and R ecommendation is adopted and approved. Accordingly, Defendant Wyatt's Motion to Dismiss (Docket No. 74) is GRANTED, and Plaintiff's claims against Defendant Wyatt are DISMISSED. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Todd J. Campbell on 8/22/12. (xc:Pro se party by regular and certified mail.)(afs)
July 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 102 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: The Magistrate Judge RECOMMENDS that deft Gibson's 76 Motion to Dismiss be GRANTED, and that the complaint against him be DISMISSED with prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge John S. Bryant on 7/16/12. (xc:Pro se party by regular and certified mail.)(rd)
January 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER: Motion re Service of Pleadings on Defendants 53 is Granted, as follows. Plaintiff shall file all pleadings, motions and other papers relating to this case with the Clerk and shall serve such papers upon any individual defendant directly affe cted by such pleading, motion or other paper. All other defendants shall be served electronically through the Court's CM/ECF system. Any party may seek review of this order upon motion if problems arise in service of plaintiffs filings. Signed by Magistrate Judge John S. Bryant on 1/3/12. (xc:Pro se party by regular and certified mail.)(dt)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Teats v. Johnson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tennessee Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Victor S. Johnson, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Carson Drumwright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rachel Sobrero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Randall Wyatt, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David D. Torrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michie F. Gibson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John-Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Davidson County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gayle Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: District Attorneys
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerome M. Teats
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?