SunTrust Bank et al v. GLS Florida Property 2, LLC et al
Plaintiff: SunTrust Bank
Defendant: GLS Florida Property 2, LLC, Nashyork, LLC, Peter McKenna, Roger S. Aaron, Earle Yaffa, Ronald J. Weiss, Jason Flom, James Stroud, Herbert L. Graham, Glenn W. Johnson, Elliot Levine, Elizabeth Yates and Dwight Wiles
Case Number: 3:2011cv00829
Filed: August 30, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Office: Nashville Office
County: Davidson
Presiding Judge: Juliet E. Griffin
Presiding Judge: John T. Nixon
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER GRANTING VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AND FINAL ORDGE IN THIS MATTER: Defendant GLENN W. JOHNSON is dismissed from the this action with prejudice. Costs of this action shall be taxed to Defendant. All matters in the above-styled action are now concluded and this case is set to be closed. THIS IS A FINAL ORDE. Signed by Senior Judge John T. Nixon on 3/21/12. (dt)
March 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 96 AGREED FINAL JUDGMENT: A final judgment shall be and is hereby entered in Plaintiffs favor and against GLS and NashYork, jointly and severally, in the total amount of $600,000.00, for which execution may issue, and bearing interest from the date of entry hereon at the statutory rate of interest for judgments. Each party to this action shall bear their own costs and attorney's fees. Signed by Senior Judge John T. Nixon on 3/19/12. (dt)
March 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER: The Clerk is directed to forward the file in this case to the Honorable John T. Nixon for his consideration of the proposed agreed final judgment against defendants GLS and NashYork 92 , and the unopposed motion for dismissal with prejudice o f defendant Stroud 93 and proposed order granting voluntary dismissal with prejudice of defendant Stroud and for his consideration of the plaintiff's motion for dismissal of defendant Johnson and entry of final judgment in this case, with a pr oposed order, to be filed within one working day of entry of the orders of final judgment against defendants GLS and NashYork and dismissal of defendant Stroud. Unless otherwise directed by the Court or upon motion of the parties, there will be no further proceedings before the Magistrate Judge in this case. Judge Magistrate Judge Juliet E. Griffin no longer assigned to case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Juliet E. Griffin on 3/13/12. (dt)
March 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER GRANTING VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: Motion With Prejudice Defendants Peter McKenna, Estate of Joseph Flom, Roger S. Aaron, Earle Yaffa, and Ronald J. Weiss, co-executors, Jason Flom, Herbert Graham, Elliot Levine, and Elizabeth Yates 89 is Granted. Signed by Senior Judge John T. Nixon on 3/5/12. (dt)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SunTrust Bank et al v. GLS Florida Property 2, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SunTrust Bank
Represented By: Ronald G. Steen, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GLS Florida Property 2, LLC
Represented By: Cynthia S. McKenzie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nashyork, LLC
Represented By: Cynthia S. McKenzie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter McKenna
Represented By: Cynthia S. McKenzie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roger S. Aaron
Represented By: John R. Jacobson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Earle Yaffa
Represented By: John R. Jacobson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald J. Weiss
Represented By: John R. Jacobson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Flom
Represented By: Cynthia S. McKenzie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Stroud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Herbert L. Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glenn W. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elliot Levine
Represented By: Cynthia S. McKenzie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth Yates
Represented By: Cynthia S. McKenzie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dwight Wiles
Represented By: James Russell Kelley
Represented By: William Taylor Ramsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?