Tennessee Bank & Trust v. Lowery et al
Plaintiff: Tennessee Bank & Trust
Defendant: PBLF, LLC, Marion Edwin Lowery, Cynthia Lowery, Marian Elizabeth Lower Saffle, John Harrison Lowery, William Harrison Crabtree, Jr., Jim England, Richard Inman, Tommy Crocker, BBC Holdings, Inc., BOC Operations, LLC, Commerce Bancshares, Inc., Peoples State Bank of Commerce and Oakland Financial Services, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2011cv00984
Filed: October 17, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Office: Nashville Office
County: Williamson
Presiding Judge: Aleta A. Trauger
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 241 FINAL ORDER: This matter shall be and is hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Each party shall bear their own attorneys fees and costs. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 5/13/14. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
February 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 233 ORDER granting 231 Motion for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 2/4/14. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
November 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 229 ORDER: Telephone Conference set for 11/22/2013 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge John S. Bryant. Signed by Magistrate Judge John S. Bryant on 11/15/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
August 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 226 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: The Motion of defendants Richard Inman, TommyCrocker, and Jim England for sanctions pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 11 193 is DENIED. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 8/9/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
April 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 221 ORDER: MOTION to Continue Case Management Conference 220 is GRANTED, and the case management conference scheduled for 4/22/2013, is CANCELLED. The parties shall confer on their own and draft a proposed case management order, setting whatever addi tional deadlines need to be set. Following the submittal of that order, the court will reset the trial. Plaintiff's local counsel shall take the lead in proposing new deadlines. The proposed new case management order shall be filed by 5/1/2013. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 4/19/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
October 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 126 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: The Joint Motion to Disqualify Plaintiff's Counsel 111 is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 10/11/2012. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(hb)
March 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 79 MEMORANDUM signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 3/30/2012. (hb)
January 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 59 INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Motion to Amend Pleadings due by 6/8/2012. Discovery due by 9/28/2012. Dispositive Motions due by 1/15/2012. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 1/23/12. (dt)
January 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER granting 51 Motion for Leave to Appear by Telephone. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 1/19/12. (dt)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tennessee Bank & Trust v. Lowery et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PBLF, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marion Edwin Lowery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cynthia Lowery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marian Elizabeth Lower Saffle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Harrison Lowery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Harrison Crabtree, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim England
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Inman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tommy Crocker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BBC Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BOC Operations, LLC
Represented By: Ernest Wilson Williams
Represented By: John David Schwalb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commerce Bancshares, Inc.
Represented By: John David Schwalb
Represented By: Ernest Wilson Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peoples State Bank of Commerce
Represented By: John David Schwalb
Represented By: Ernest Wilson Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oakland Financial Services, Inc.
Represented By: Kinika L. Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tennessee Bank & Trust
Represented By: Gary D. Jiles
Represented By: Heather J. Hubbard
Represented By: Matthew K. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?