United States of America v. Bogart et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Dustin B. Bogart, Marcy A. Bogart and Southern Country Ranch
Case Number: 3:2012cv00179
Filed: February 13, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Office: Nashville Office
County: Houston
Presiding Judge: Joe Brown
Presiding Judge: Kevin H. Sharp
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7401 IRS: Tax Liability
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 221 MEMORANDUM. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 6/23/17. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail. ) (gb)
August 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 182 ORDER: The Court hereby AWARDS Plaintiff $304,584.22, which consists of the total amount of unpaid federal income taxes, interest, and penalties owed by Dustin B. Bogart for tax years 2000, 2001, 2002, and 2003. The Clerk of the Court shall p repare and enter a final judgment in accordance with Rule 58 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by District Judge Kevin H. Sharp on 8/7/2014. (xc:Pro se party by regular and certified mail.)(DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(ds)
July 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 176 ORDER: Having considered all of the parties' arguments, the Court: ACCEPTS Magistrate Judge Brown's R & R concerning Count 1 127 ; GRANTS Plaintiff's partial-summary-judgment motion on Count 1 91 ; DENIES Defendants cross-motion for partial summary judgment 118 ; ACCEPTS IN PART and REJECTS IN PART Magistrate Judge Brown's R & R concerning Count 2 163 ; GRANTS Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment on Count 2 150 . The remainder of the pending motions are denied as moot. Signed by District Judge Kevin H. Sharp on 7/24/14. (xc:Pro se party by regular and certified mail.)(DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
October 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 127 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: The undersigned recommends that the Plaintiff's motion for Partial Summary Judgment be GRANTED and the defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment be DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe Brown on 10/17/2013. (xc:Pro se party by regular and certified mail.)(DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(eh)
August 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER granting DE 104 MOTION for Leave to Respond re 91 Partial MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by United States of America. The Defendants may have until August 30, 2013, to file a response. It is so ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe Brown on 8/13/13. (xc:Pro se party and Southern Country Ranch by regular and certified mail.)(DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(la) Modified on 8/14/2013 (la).
July 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ENTRY FOR DEFAULT: Plaintiff has filed a Motion for Entry of Default (Docket Entry No. 90 ) and a Motion for Default Judgment (Docket Entry No. 92 ) against Defendant Southern Country Ranch. The Clerk hereby enters default against Defendant Sou thern Country Ranch pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 55(a). The docket clerk is instructed to terminate as pending Plaintiff's Motion for Entry of Default (Docket Entry No. 90 ). Signed by Keith Throckmorton, Clerk of Court on 7/30/13. (xc:Pro se party by regular and certified mail.)(DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(la)
March 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER: Pending before the Court are multiple filings by Defendants Dustin and Marcy Bogart and Jerry Speer, who purports to represent Southern Country Ranch pro se as Trustee. To the extent the Bogart defendants' Motion to Dismiss 66 (along w ith a "statement in support" 73 ) asks the Court to reconsider its earlier Order 61 adopting the Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation, it is hereby DENIED. To the extent the "Notice of Status and Statement in Opposit ion to Order and Motion to Show Cause and Motion to Void and Annul All Orders" 78 filed by Speer states objections under Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) to the Magistrate Judge's Order of 11/29/2012 70 , those objections are hereby DENIED. To t he extent it states objections to the Magistrate Judge's earlier orders, those objections are hereby DENIED as untimely. Nothing in this Order disturbs the Magistrate Judge's ruling that Speer is not permitted to represent a trust pro se in this court. This case is returned to the Magistrate Judge for further case management. Signed by District Judge Kevin H. Sharp on 3/26/13. (xc:Pro se party by regular and certified mail.)(DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
January 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER: Presently pending is a Motion for 60 to 90 Days Continuanceto Seek in the Interest of Justice and Other Reasons 84 . The Magistrate Judge will extend the discovery deadline and the dispositive motion deadlines set in Paragraphs 7 and 8 of Doc ket Entry 55 by 30 days as apparently the Defendants' request in the last paragraph of their motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe Brown on 1/31/13. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail.)(DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt) Modified tEXT on 1/31/2013 (dt).
December 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER: The Bogarts have filed a motion to dismiss 66 to which the Defendant Southern Country Ranch has attempted to join 71 . To the extent this motion is an effort to request the Magistrate Judge to reconsider his earlier report and recommendatio n, it is DENIED. To the extent that it is a motion for the District Judge to reconsider his order adopting the report and recommendation, that is a matter for the District Judge to decide. The Magistrate Judge believes that his motion to join the Def endants' motion to dismiss 71 must be stricken inasmuch as it was not filed by an attorney on behalf of Southern Country Ranch. If Mr. Speer disagrees with this ruling by the Magistrate Judge he should file a notice of appeal with Judge Sharp within 14 days of the entry of this Order. Mr. Speer has sent the Court a notice of status and statement in opposition to order and motions to show cause and motion to void and annul all orders on 12/10/2012. The Clerk will docket this as a motion to reconsider my earlier orders, which is denied. I also decline to recuse myself from this case. It also appears this document is also an attempt to appeal my earlier orders. As such, the Clerk should forward this pleading to Judge Sharp for his consi deration as an appeal. The defendants should file an answer to the complaint within 28 days of the entry of this Order. Failure to do so can result in the Government seeking a default. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe Brown on 12/19/12. (xc:Pro se party by regular and certified mail.)(DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt) Modified Text on 12/21/2012 (dt).
November 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER: Telephone conference held on 11/28/2012. As an initial matter it appears that certified mail send to Mr. and Mrs. Bogart is being returned as undeliverable. However, they advised that they are receiving regular mail. The Clerk will send Mr. an d Mrs. Bogart and Mr. Jerry Speer further orders and other notices in this case by regular mail and email only. Mr. Speer, the Trustee, was allowed to remain on the telephone conference call and the Clerk should send a copy of this order to Mr. Jerry Speer, 5290 Highway 147, Steward, TN 37175. At this point the Clerk will enter Mr. Speer as only an interested party. The Magistrate Judge is of the firm opinion that Mr. Speer may not file any formal pleadings on behalf of Southern Country Ranch. F ailure to obtain counsel could result in a default against the trust. The Government should respond to the pending motion to dismiss 66 within the time provided in the Local Rules. The Bogarts requested a copy of the recording of this telephone con ference and the Magistrate Judge will provide with this order a audio CD of the telephone conference and the Clerk is directed to send a copy to Mr. Speer, counsel for the Government, and to Mr. Bogart. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe Brown on 11/29/12. (xc:Pro se party and Mr. Speer by regular mail only.)(DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
November 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER: In the Initial Case Management Order entered on October 4, 2012, (Docket Entry No. 55 ) the date set for the trial of November 29, 2013 is incorrect. This case is hereby scheduled for a non-jury trial on Tuesday, November 26, 2013, beginning at 9:00 a.m. The Final Pretrial Conference remains set for October 28, 2013 at 1:30 p.m. The deadlines for trial-related matters will be addressed in a subsequent Order closer to the trial date. Signed by District Judge Kevin H. Sharp on 11/28/12. (xc:Pro se party by regular and certified mail.)(DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
October 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER: The Report and Recommendations 53 is Accepted and Approved. Defendants' Motion to Dismiss 35 is Denied. Defendants' Motion for Consolidation 48 is Denied. This case is hereby returned to Magistrate Judge Brown for further pretrial case management. Signed by District Judge Kevin H. Sharp on 10/30/12. (xc:Pro se party by regular and certified mail.)(DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
October 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 55 INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Discovery due by 4/30/2013. Dispositive Motions due by 5/31/2013. Telephone Conference set for 11/28/2012 at 10:00 AM CST. To participate in the conference call, parties will call 615-695-2851 at the scheduled time. Aft er consulting with Judge Sharp's courtroom deputy, this matter is set for Bench Trial on 11/29/2013 at 9:00 AM. Pretrial Conference set for 10/28/2013 at 1:30 PM before District Judge Kevin H. Sharp. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe Brown on 10/4/12. (xc:Pro se party by regular and certified mail.)(DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
September 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 53 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: Magistrate Judge Brown RECOMMENDS that the Motion to Dismiss 35 and the Motion for Consolidation and Transfer 48 be Denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe Brown on 9/28/12. (xc:Pro se party by regular and certified mail.)(DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
September 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference by telephone is set for 9/24/2012 at 3:30 PM. To participate in the conference call, parties will call 615-695-2851 at the scheduled time. The Bogarts should email to the Magistrate Judge's office (brown chambers@tnmd.uscourts.gov) any changes they suggest to theproposed scheduling order by NOON, 9/24/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe Brown on 9/18/12. (xc:Pro se party by regular and certified mail.)(DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
September 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 37 DENIAL OF ENTRY OF DEFAULT AS MOOT: The requests for entry of default are denied as moot. This determination also renders moot Defendants' motion to dismiss the requests for entry of default. The docket clerk is directed to terminate as pending docket entries 14, 15, 16 and 19. Signed by Clerk of Court Keith Throckmorton on 9/4/12. (xc:Pro se party by regular and certified mail.)(dt)
August 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER: The Clerk is directed to strike the motion to dismiss 28 without prejudice to refiling. The motion for a 60 to 90 day delay for the initial case management conference 30 is DENIED without prejudice to being refiled after the initial case m anagement conference which remains set for 9/24/2012 27 . The Government is directed to file with the Court within 14 days a statement of why this case should not, or could not, be consolidated in a single court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe Brown on 8/28/12. (xc:Pro se party by regular and certified mail.)(dt)
August 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER: In the Clerk does not grant default as to the individuals, a scheduling order needs to be set in this matter. Accordingly, a hearing is set for Monday, 9/24/2012, at 3:30 p.m., Courtroom 783. In preparation for the hearing, the attorneys for t he Plaintiff should prepare a draft scheduling order in accordance with the usual form used by the undersigned Magistrate Judge and send a copy of it to the Defendants at least seven days prior to the scheduled conference. The Defendants should bring with them to the case management conference any changes they wish to make, along with a page summary of their theory of the case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe Brown on 8/22/12. (dt)
April 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: MOTION to Continue Case Management Conference 3 is Granted. Case Management Conference is reset for 5/30/2012 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Joe Brown. The Clerk will send a copy of the docket sheet and this Order to the named Defendants at the addresses listed in the complaint for informational purposes only. This mailing does not constitute a service of process. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe Brown on 4/4/12. (dt)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Bogart et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: E. Christopher Lambert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dustin B. Bogart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marcy A. Bogart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southern Country Ranch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?