A.O. Smith Corporation et al v. United States of America
Plaintiff: |
Opryland Attractions, LLC, Wildhorse Saloon Entertainment Ventures, Inc., OLH, G.P., Gaylord Hotels, Inc., A.O. Smith Corporation, Gaylord Entertainment Company, Opryland Hotel Nashville, LLC, Grand Ole Opry, LLC and Gaylord Program Services, Inc. |
Defendant: |
United States of America |
Case Number: |
3:2012cv00429 |
Filed: |
April 30, 2012 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee |
Office: |
Nashville Office |
County: |
Davidson |
Presiding Judge: |
William J. Haynes |
Nature of Suit: |
Torts to Land |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 2671 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
February 28, 2013 |
Filing
42
ORDER: Pending before the Court is Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (Docket No. 28). The Court heard argument on Defendant's Motion on February 13, 2013. For the reasons stated in the accompanying Memorandum, Defendant's Motion is GRANTED, and this action is DISMISSED. This Order shall constitute the final judgment in this case pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 58. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Todd J. Campbell on 2/28/13. (af)
|
January 10, 2013 |
Filing
38
ORDER: United States' Motion for Extension of Time and Page Limit for its Reply Brief in Support of its Motion to Dismiss the Complaint 37 is Granted. The United States shall have until 1/25/2013, to file its reply brief in support of its motion to dismiss. Signed by District Judge Todd J. Campbell on 1/10/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
|
November 16, 2012 |
Filing
34
ORDER: In light of the recent Order 54 in the related case of Continental Insurance Company v. United States, Case No. 3-12-cv-0433, Plaintiffs' Response to the pending Motion to Dismiss 28 shall be filed by 12/17/2012. Any Reply shall be filed by 1/16/2013. The Court will hear argument on Defendant's Motion on 2/13/2013, at 1:00 p.m. Signed by District Judge Todd J. Campbell on 11/16/12. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
|
September 20, 2012 |
Filing
27
ORDER granting 26 Motion for Extension of Page Limit for its Brief in Support of its Motion to Dismiss the Complaint. The United States' brief in support of its motion to dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint shall not exceed eighty (80) pages. Signed by District Judge Todd J. Campbell on 9/20/12. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
|
August 6, 2012 |
Filing
24
INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. (SEE ORDER FOR OTHER DEADLINES) Signed by Magistrate Judge E. Clifton Knowles on 8/6/12. (dt)
|
July 24, 2012 |
Filing
21
ORDER: The parties shall be prepared to discuss the Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint at the Initial Case Management Conference which is set for 8/3/2012, at 11:00 a.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge E. Clifton Knowles on 7/24/12. (dt)
|
July 19, 2012 |
Filing
19
ORDER granting 18 Motion for Leave to File Reply Brief. Signed by Magistrate Judge E. Clifton Knowles on 7/19/12. (dt)
|
June 25, 2012 |
Filing
14
ORDER: Joint MOTION to Continue Initial Case Management Conference 13 is Granted. Initial Case Management Conference is reset for 8/3/2012 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge E. Clifton Knowles. Signed by Magistrate Judge E. Clifton Knowles on 6/25/12. (dt)
|
May 2, 2012 |
Filing
9
ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01. This case shall be set for trial upon completion of the initial case management conference by order of the District Judge. Signed by Chief Judge Todd J. Campbell on 5/2/12. (dt)
|
May 1, 2012 |
Filing
6
ORDER OF RECUSAL. District Judge William J. Haynes, Jr recused. Case reassigned to District Judge Kevin H. Sharp for all further proceedings. Signed by District Judge William J. Haynes, Jr on 5/1/12. (dt)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?