Harris v. Clark Construction Group
Plaintiff: Stanley Harris
Defendant: Clark Construction Group
Case Number: 3:2012cv00649
Filed: June 26, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Office: Nashville Office
County: Davidson
Presiding Judge: Joe Brown
Presiding Judge: Kevin H. Sharp
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER: The Court is in receipt of a Joint Stipulation of Dismissal 56 . Accordingly, the Clerk is directed to close the file. This Order shall constitute the final judgment in this case pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 58. Signed by District Judge Todd J. Campbell on 12/12/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
June 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER granting 40 Motion for Leave to File Reply Brief. Signed by Magistrate Judge John S. Bryant on 6/4/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
May 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge E. Clifton Knowles recused. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge John S. Bryant for all further proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge E. Clifton Knowles on 5/23/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
May 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER: Jury Trial set for 7/1/2014 at 9:00 AM before District Judge Todd J. Campbell. Pretrial Conference set for 6/23/2014 at 9:00 AM before District Judge Todd J. Campbell. Exhibit List and Witness List due by 6/16/2014. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 6/16/2014. Signed by District Judge Todd J. Campbell on 5/14/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
April 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER denying as moot 28 Motion for Leave to Serve Interrogatories and Reqest for Production. Signed by Magistrate Judge E. Clifton Knowles on 4/23/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
March 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER: Joint MOTION to Modify Scheduling Order 30 is Granted. Discovery due by 7/17/2013. Dispositive Motions due by 8/30/2013. Any other motions shall be filed by 8/30/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge John S. Bryant on 3/1/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
September 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SCHEDULING ORDER: Motion to Amend Pleadings due by 11/5/2012. Discovery due by 3/5/2013. Dispositive Motions due by 4/5/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge E. Clifton Knowles on 9/4/12. (xc:Pro se party by regular and certified mail.)(dt)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harris v. Clark Construction Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stanley Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clark Construction Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?