American Federation of Musicians for the United States and Canada, AFL-CIO v. Adams et al
Plaintiff: American Federation of Musicians for the United States and Canada, AFL-CIO
Defendant: Jimmy L. Adams and Jimmy Adams Media LLC.
Case Number: 3:2012cv00969
Filed: September 19, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Office: Nashville Office
County: Davidson
Presiding Judge: Todd J. Campbell
Presiding Judge: Juliet E. Griffin
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29:185 Labor/Mgt. Relations (Contracts)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 30 AGREED ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge Todd J. Campbell on 5/13/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
May 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER: Telephone Conference held on 5/7/2013, at which time they advised that they had reached a resolution of this case. By 5/15/2013, the parties shall file an agreed order of dismissal. The Clerk is directed to forward the file in this case to the Honorable Todd J. Campbell for his consideration of the parties' agreed order of dismissal to be filed no later than 5/15/2013. Unless otherwise directed by the Court or upon motion of the parties, there will be no further proceedings before the Magistrate Judge in this case. Judge Magistrate Judge Juliet E. Griffin no longer assigned to case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Juliet E. Griffin on 5/9/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
May 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER: Counsel for the parties shall convene another telephone conference call with the Court on Tuesday, 5/7/2013, at 10:00 a.m., central time, to address whether the defendants have made a firm and realistic offer, the plaintiff's position on the offer, and, if a resolution of this case is not possible, to address the plaintiff's outstanding written discovery, any protective order suggested by the defendants, and any other appropriate matters. Signed by Magistrate Judge Juliet E. Griffin on 5/3/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
February 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER: Pursuant to the order entered 12/6/2012 24 , counsel for the parties called the Court on 2/1/2013, at which time they advised that the defendants have not yet made a settlement proposal but that they hope to do so within 3-4 weeks. However, until and unless the parties are able to reach a resolution of the case, they will proceed in accord with the orders entered 12/6/2012, 23 - 24 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Juliet E. Griffin on 2/4/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
December 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER: Bench Trial set for 2/18/2014 at 9:00 AM before District Judge Todd J. Campbell. Pretrial Conference set for 2/10/2014 at 10:30 AM before District Judge Todd J. Campbell. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 2/3/2014. Signed by District Judge Todd J. Campbell on 12/10/12. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
December 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 24 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER #2. Signed by Magistrate Judge Juliet E. Griffin on 12/6/12. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
November 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 20 DENIAL OF DEFAULT. Signed by Clerk of Court Keith Throckmorton on 11/30/12. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
November 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: Second MOTION to Continue Case Management Conference 14 is Granted. Initial Case Management Conference is reset for 12/5/2012 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Juliet E. Griffin. Except as provided above, the 10/31/2012, order remains in full force and effect. Signed by Magistrate Judge Juliet E. Griffin on 11/21/12. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
September 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management. Discovery is not stayed absent order of the District Judge. This case shall be set for trial upon completion of the initial case management conference by order of the District Judge. Signed by District Judge Todd J. Campbell on 9/19/12. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American Federation of Musicians for the United States and Canada, AFL-CIO v. Adams et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Federation of Musicians for the United States and Canada, AFL-CIO
Represented By: Jennifer P. Garner
Represented By: Robert Jan Jennings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jimmy L. Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jimmy Adams Media LLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?