Watkins v. CCA-Corporation of America et al
Plaintiff: |
Larry Tyrone Watkins |
Defendant: |
f/n/u Perry, CCA-Corporation of America, Terry Kinnaman and Y. Bermudez |
Case Number: |
3:2012cv00984 |
Filed: |
September 24, 2012 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee |
Office: |
Nashville Office |
County: |
Davidson |
Presiding Judge: |
Aleta A. Trauger |
Nature of Suit: |
Prisoner: Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
September 25, 2013 |
Filing
43
ORDER: On September 5, 2013, the Magistrate Judge issued a Report and Recommendation (Docket No. 39 ), to which no timely objections have been filed. The Report and Recommendation is therefore ACCEPTED and made the findings of fact and conclusion s of law of this court. For the reasons expressed therein, it is hereby ORDERED that the Motion For Summary Judgment filed by the only remaining defendant in this case, Terry Kinnaman, (Docket No. 31 ) is GRANTED, and this case is DISMISSED in its entirety WITH PREJUDICE. It is so ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 9/25/2013. (xc:Pro se party by regular and certified mail.)(DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(hb)
|
February 11, 2013 |
Filing
24
ORDER SETTING CASE FOR TRIAL: Jury Trial set for 1/28/2014 at 9:00 AM before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. Pretrial Conference set for 1/24/2014 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 661 before Magistrate Judge E. Clifton Knowles. Exhibit List and Witness List due by 1/20/2014. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 1/20/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge E. Clifton Knowles on 2/11/13. (xc:Pro se party by regular and certified mail.)(DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
|
February 5, 2013 |
Filing
18
SCHEDULING ORDER: Motion to Amend Pleadings due by 4/8/2013. Discovery due by 8/8/2013. Dispositive Motions due by 9/9/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge E. Clifton Knowles on 2/5/13. (xc:Pro se party by regular and certified mail.)(DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
|
November 26, 2012 |
Filing
7
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 11/26/12. (xc:Pro se party by regular and certified mail.)(DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?