Hamby v. McCullough et al
Plaintiff: |
William Davidson Hamby, Jr. |
Defendant: |
Valerie McCullough and Daron Hall |
Case Number: |
3:2012cv01239 |
Filed: |
November 28, 2012 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee |
Office: |
Nashville Office |
County: |
Davidson |
Presiding Judge: |
John S. Bryant |
Presiding Judge: |
Aleta A. Trauger |
Nature of Suit: |
Prisoner: Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
May 20, 2013 |
Filing
47
ORDER: The Report and Recommendation 44 is therefore ACCEPTED and made the findings of fact and conclusions of law of this court. For the reasons expressed therein, it is hereby ORDERED that the plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss his Complaint 43 is GRANTED, and the Complaint is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 5/20/13. (xc:Pro se party by regular and certified mail.)(DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
|
April 23, 2013 |
Filing
44
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: Magistrate Judge Bryant RECOMMENDS that Plaintiff's motion to dismiss his complaint 43 be GRANTED and that the complaint be DISMISSED without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge John S. Bryant on 4/23/13. (xc:Pro se party by regular and certified mail.)(DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
|
March 25, 2013 |
Filing
36
DENIAL OF ENTRY OF DEFAULT: denying 35 Motion for Entry of Default. On 3/1/2013, the Court granted Defendants' motion for an extension of time 18 . Defendants were given until 3/20/2013, to respond to the Complaint against them. The Defe ndants filed an Answer with the Court on 3/19/2013. Accordingly, the Clerk declines to enter default. Plaintiff's motion is denied. Signed by Clerk of Court Keith Throckmorton on 3/25/13. (xc:Pro se party by regular and certified mail.)(DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt) Modified Text on 3/26/2013 (dt).
|
March 22, 2013 |
Filing
32
ORDER: Plaintiff Hamby has filed his motion to ascertain status 14 . This motion is GRANTED. The Defendants filed their answer on March 19, 2013, andthat same day a scheduling order containing pretrial deadlines was entered by the Court 26 . On Mar ch 21, the case was set for a jury trial before District Judge Trauger on May 27, 2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge John S. Bryant on 3/22/13. (xc:Pro se party by regular and certified mail.)(DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
|
March 21, 2013 |
Filing
28
ORDER: Jury Trial is set for 5/27/2014 at 9:00 AM before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. The Magistrate Judge shall conduct the pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order. He shall assist the plaintiff with the preparation of subpoenas, discu ss exhibits, instructions and all other matters necessary for having the case prepared to be tried on the date set. The Magistrate Judge has been managing this case. If he considers it appropriate to appoint counsel to represent the plaintiff at trial, he should do so. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 3/21/13. (xc:Pro se party by regular and certified mail.)(DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
|
March 19, 2013 |
Filing
26
SCHEDULING ORDER: Motion to Amend Pleadings due by 5/20/2013. Discovery due by 7/22/2013. Dispositive Motions due by 8/19/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge John S. Bryant on 3/19/13. (xc:Pro se party by regular and certified mail.)(DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
|
March 7, 2013 |
Filing
21
DENIAL OF ENTRY OF DEFAULT. Signed by Clerk of Court Keith Throckmorton on 3/7/13. (xc:Pro se party by regular and certified mail.)(DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
|
January 10, 2013 |
Filing
9
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 1/10/13. (xc:Pro se party by regular and certified mail.)(DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?