Hensel v. City of Mount Juliet et al
Plaintiff: Donald A. Hensel
Defendant: City of Mount Juliet, Michael Rountree, Jason Brockman, Scott Fulton, City of Lebanon, Jason Pruitte and Jeremy Johnson
Case Number: 3:2012cv01298
Filed: December 13, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Office: Nashville Office
County: Wilson
Presiding Judge: Todd J. Campbell
Presiding Judge: E. Clifton Knowles
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER AND MEMORANDUM: Pending before the Court is a letter for review by Plaintiff Donald A. Hensel (Doc. No. 55 ), to which the Defendants jointly have responded in opposition (Doc. No. 56 ). Plaintiff's case was not dismissed because his a ttorneys withdrew. His case was dismissed because he failed to respond to the Court's Orders. He did not prosecute and participate in his own case and, for unknown reasons, he did not seek any recourse until nearly five years after his case w as dismissed. Plaintiff's letter, which the Court construes as a motion to reopen and a motion for relief from judgment (Doc. No. 55 ), therefore is DENIED. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 8/8/2018. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail. ) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(mg)
December 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER: The Report and Recommendation 44 is adopted and approved. This action is DISMISSED without prejudice, and the Clerk is directed to close the file. Any pending Motions are denied as moot. This Order shall constitute the final judgment in this case pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 58. Signed by District Judge Todd J. Campbell on 12/4/13. (xc:Pro se party by regular and certified mail.)(DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
November 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 44 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: The Magistrate Judge recommends that this action be dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge E. Clifton Knowles on 11/15/13. (xc:Pro se party by regular and certified mail.)(DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
February 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to 1 Complaint and to Reset the Initial Case Management Conference 14 is Granted. Initial Case Management Conference is reset for 3/19/2013 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge E. Clifton Knowles. Signed by Magistrate Judge E. Clifton Knowles on 2/6/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hensel v. City of Mount Juliet et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald A. Hensel
Represented By: Benjamin Kraft Raybin
Represented By: David J. Weissman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Mount Juliet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Rountree
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Brockman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Fulton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Lebanon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Pruitte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeremy Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?