Clark v. E! Entertainment Television, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: |
Corey D. Clark |
Defendant: |
Gibson Dunn & Crutcher, Morrison Foerester, Fox Inc., E! Entertainment Television International Holdings, LLC and E! Entertainment Television, Inc. |
Case Number: |
3:2013cv00058 |
Filed: |
January 25, 2013 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee |
Office: |
Nashville Office |
County: |
Wilson |
Presiding Judge: |
E. Clifton Knowles |
Presiding Judge: |
Kevin H. Sharp |
Nature of Suit: |
Assault Libel & Slander |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Libel,Assault,Slander |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
March 26, 2018 |
Filing
162
MEMORANDUM OPINION OF THE COURT. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 3/26/2018. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(mg)
|
October 10, 2014 |
Filing
100
MEMORANDUM signed by Chief Judge Kevin H. Sharp on 10/10/2014. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(hb)
|
July 31, 2014 |
Filing
98
ORDER granting 97 Motion for Leave to File Reply. Signed by District Judge Kevin H. Sharp on 7/31/2014. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (ds)
|
June 12, 2014 |
Filing
91
ORDER: For the reasons set forth in the accompanying Memorandum, the Motions to Dismiss filed by Defendants E! Entertainment Television, LLC and Fox Broadcasting Company 41 & 43 are hereby GRANTED and this case is hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. The Clerk of the Court shall enter a final judgment in accordance with Rule 58 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by District Judge Kevin H. Sharp on 6/12/14. (dt)
|
March 14, 2014 |
Filing
83
ORDER granting 46 Motion for Judicial Notice in support of Motion to Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Kevin H. Sharp on 3/14/14. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
|
March 13, 2014 |
Filing
82
ORDER granting 81 Motion for Oral Argument Regaring Motions to Dismiss. The Court will hear oral argument on the pending motions to dismiss on Monday, 4/21/2014, at 10:00 a.m. Signed by District Judge Kevin H. Sharp on 3/13/14. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
|
February 3, 2014 |
Filing
79
ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference is reset for 3/27/2014 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge E. Clifton Knowles. Signed by Magistrate Judge E. Clifton Knowles on 2/3/14. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
|
December 2, 2013 |
Filing
74
ORDER granting 72 Joint MOTION to Continue Case Management Conference and Maintain Stay on Discovery Pending District Court's Ruling on Defendants' Motions to Dismiss. Initial Case Management Conference is continued to 1/6/2014 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge E. Clifton Knowles. Signed by Magistrate Judge E. Clifton Knowles on 12/2/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
|
May 23, 2013 |
Filing
24
ORDER: Motion to Dismiss 21 is Denied as Moot in view of Docket No. 23. Signed by Magistrate Judge E. Clifton Knowles on 5/23/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
|
May 21, 2013 |
Filing
20
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 17 Amended Complaint. For the foregoing reasons, Plaintiff's "First Amended Complaint" (Docket No. 17)should be STRICKEN. Signed by Magistrate Judge E. Clifton Knowles on 5/21/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
|
April 17, 2013 |
Filing
15
ORDER: The Initial Case Management Conference is continued and will be reset by separate Order. This MOTION To Appear at 4-22-13 CMC by Telephone 14 is Denied as moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge E. Clifton Knowles on 4/17/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?