American Casualty Company of Reading, Pennsylvania et al v. Cresent Enterprises, Inc.
Plaintiff: |
American Casualty Company of Reading, Pennsylvania and CNA Claimplus, Inc. |
Defendant: |
Cresent Enterprises, Inc. |
Case Number: |
3:2013cv00098 |
Filed: |
February 7, 2013 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee |
Office: |
Nashville Office |
County: |
Sumner |
Presiding Judge: |
Aleta A. Trauger |
Nature of Suit: |
Insurance |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract |
Jury Demanded By: |
Defendant |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
August 28, 2014 |
Filing
82
ORDER AND JUDGMENT: The defendant's Motion to Strike the Affidavit of Cynthia Goral (Docket No. 59) is DENIED. The plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment (Docket No. 43) is GRANTED. The defendant's counterclaim is DISMISSED WIT H PREJUDICE. Counts Two and Three of the plaintiffs' Amended Complaint are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. It is further ORDERED that judgment shall be entered for the plaintiffs in the amount of $84,247.00 in compensatory damages and $1 3,503.76 in contractual interest, as well as attorney's fees, subject to the court's review of a declaration to be filed by the plaintiffs accounting for their legal costs of collection. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 8/28/2014. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (ds)
|
April 18, 2014 |
Filing
74
ORDER denying 54 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge E. Clifton Knowles on 4/18/14. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
|
April 17, 2014 |
Filing
72
ORDER: Given the pendency of a Motion to Compel presently pending before Judge Knowles plus several pending motions before this judge, it is hereby ORDERED that the trial scheduled for June 3, 2014 and the pretrial conference scheduled for May 30, 2014 are CONTINUED, to be reset, if appropriate, after a decision on all pending motions. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 4/17/14. (dt)
|
November 13, 2013 |
Filing
41
ORDER: The Motion for a Qualified Protective Order 24 and Motion to Compel Discovery 25 are Denied as Moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge E. Clifton Knowles on 11/13/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
|
October 17, 2013 |
Filing
36
ORDER granting 30 Motion to Seal information filed by Defendant. Signed by Magistrate Judge E. Clifton Knowles on 10/17/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(la)
|
October 15, 2013 |
Filing
35
ORDER granting 34 Motion for Leave to File Reply. Signed by Magistrate Judge E. Clifton Knowles on 10/15/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
|
April 11, 2013 |
Filing
14
ORDER granting 12 Motion to Allow Out of State Counsel to Attend Initial Case Management Conference via Telephone. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 4/11/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?