O'Connor et al v. Cunningham et al
Plaintiff: |
Tabetha O'Connor, Ricky O'Connor, Jane Doe and Shawn O'Connor |
Defendant: |
Christopher Cunningham and Sumner County, Tennessee |
Case Number: |
3:2013cv00229 |
Filed: |
March 15, 2013 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee |
Office: |
Nashville Office |
County: |
Sumner |
Presiding Judge: |
E. Clifton Knowles |
Presiding Judge: |
John T. Nixon |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
August 12, 2016 |
Filing
58
ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS: Pending before the Court is a Report and Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge (Doc. No. 57), to which no Objections have been filed. The Court has reviewed the Report and Recommendation and conducted a de novo review of the record. The Report and Recommendation is ADOPTED. Accordingly, Plaintiffs' Motion for Default Judgment filed by (Doc. No. 40 ) is GRANTED. The Clerk shall enter judgment for Plaintiff Jane Doe against Defendant Christop her Cunningham for $300,000.00 in compensatory damages, and $300,000.00 in punitive damages. The Clerk shall enter judgment for Plaintiffs Tabetha O'Connor, Ricky O'Connor, and Shawn O'Connor against Defendant Christopher Cunningham for $75,000.00 each in compensatory damages, and $75,000.00 each in punitive damages. This is the final order in this case. Signed by District Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 8/12/2016. (eh)
|
July 25, 2016 |
Filing
57
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: The undersigned recommends that compensatory damages of $300,000 be awarded to Jane Doe against Defendant Christopher Cunningham. The undersigned further recommends that Tabetha O'Connor, Ricky O'Connor, an d Shawn OConnor be awarded compensatory damages of $75,000 each against Defendant Cunningham. The undersigned further recommends that punitive damages of $300,000 be awarded to Jane Doe against Defendant Christopher Cunningham. The unders igned further recommends that Tabetha O'Connor, Ricky O'Connor, and Shawn O'Connor be awarded punitive damages of $75,000 each against Defendant Cunningham. Signed by Magistrate Judge E. Clifton Knowles on 7/25/2016. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(eh)
|
June 28, 2016 |
Filing
54
MEMORANDUM OPINION OF THE COURT. Signed by District Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 6/28/2016. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(eh)
|
July 17, 2013 |
Filing
16
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Jury Trial set for 10/28/2014 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 774 before Judge John T. Nixon. Pretrial Conference set for 10/17/2014 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 774 before Judge John T. Nixon. Amended Pleadings due by 11/8/2013. Discovery due by 3/13/2014. Dispositive Motions due by 6/13/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge E. Clifton Knowles on 7/17/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(la)
|
May 3, 2013 |
Filing
7
ORDER: Joint MOTION to Continue Initial Case Management Conference 6 is Granted. Initial Case Management Conference reset for 6/5/2013 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge E. Clifton Knowles. Signed by Magistrate Judge E. Clifton Knowles on 5/3/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?