Allied Waste North America, Inc. et al v. Lewis, King, Krieg & Waldrop, P.C. et al
Plaintiff: |
Allied Waste North America, Inc. and BFI Waste Services, LLC |
Defendant: |
Lewis, King, Krieg & Waldrop, P.C., Linda Hamilton Mowles and Deborah Stevens |
Case Number: |
3:2013cv00254 |
Filed: |
March 20, 2013 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee |
Office: |
Nashville Office |
County: |
Davidson |
Presiding Judge: |
Joe Brown |
Presiding Judge: |
Kevin H. Sharp |
Nature of Suit: |
Personal Property: Other |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity - Legal Malpractice |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
December 8, 2016 |
Filing
292
MEMORANDUM signed by Chief Judge Kevin H. Sharp on 12/8/2016. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(hb)
|
March 20, 2015 |
Filing
132
MEMORANDUM signed by Chief Judge Kevin H. Sharp on 3/20/2015. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(hb)
|
June 20, 2013 |
Filing
26
ORDER: Pursuant to the Stipulation of Dismissal of Claims Against Michael A. Geracioti 24 filed by the parties, Defendant Michael A. Geracioti is hereby dismissed without prejudice pursuant to Rule 41(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by District Judge Kevin H. Sharp on 6/20/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Search for this case: Allied Waste North America, Inc. et al v. Lewis, King, Krieg & Waldrop, P.C. et al |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: Allied Waste North America, Inc. |
Represented By: |
Todd M. Allison |
Represented By: |
Kenneth Ray Jones, Jr. |
Represented By: |
Douglas C. Northup |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: BFI Waste Services, LLC |
Represented By: |
Todd M. Allison |
Represented By: |
Kenneth Ray Jones, Jr. |
Represented By: |
Douglas C. Northup |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Lewis, King, Krieg & Waldrop, P.C. |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Linda Hamilton Mowles |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Deborah Stevens |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?