The Adam Group, Inc. of Middle Tennessee v. Tunnell et al
Plaintiff: |
The Adam Group, Inc. of Middle Tennessee |
Defendant: |
Daniel Christopher Tunnell, Keagan Brown, Annie Tunnell McDaniel and Karl Dumas |
Case Number: |
3:2013cv00258 |
Filed: |
March 20, 2013 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee |
Office: |
Nashville Office |
County: |
Davidson |
Presiding Judge: |
E. Clifton Knowles |
Presiding Judge: |
Kevin H. Sharp |
Nature of Suit: |
Racketeer/Corrupt Organization |
Cause of Action: |
18 U.S.C. § 1962 Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
September 22, 2014 |
Filing
72
ORDER granting 33 , 34 , 35 , 40 and 48 Motions to Quash; denying as moot 39 Motion to Stay and 55 Motion for Protective Order; granting 42 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery and 65 Motion for status conference an d to extend all deadlines pending decision on application for entry of default and all outstanding discovery motions. Counsel are hereby directed to confer and to file by October 3, 2014, a proposed revised case management order containing pretrial deadlines to govern the progress of this case toward trial. Signed by Magistrate Judge John S. Bryant on 9/22/14. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
|
August 13, 2014 |
Filing
69
ORDER denying 63 Motion for Entry of Default. Signed by Keith Throckmorton, Clerk of Court on 8/13/2014. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (ds)
|
June 19, 2014 |
Filing
62
ORDER: For the reasons explained in the accompanying Memorandum, Defendants' Motion to Dismiss 9 is hereby DENIED. This case is returned to Magistrate Judge Knowles for further pretrial management and consideration of the outstanding discovery motions (Docket Nos. 33, 34, 35, 39, 40, 42, 48 & 55). Signed by District Judge Kevin H. Sharp on 6/19/14. (dt)
|
March 12, 2014 |
Filing
45
ORDER granting 44 Motion for Leave to File Reply Brief. Signed by Magistrate Judge John S. Bryant on 3/12/14. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
|
May 21, 2013 |
Filing
24
INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Motion to Amend Pleadings due by 12/29/2013. Discovery due by 3/31/2014. Dispositive Motions due by 8/1/2014. Jury Trial set for 12/9/2014 09:00 AM before District Judge Kevin H. Sharp. Pretrial Conference set for 1 1/17/2014 at 1:30 PM before District Judge Kevin H. Sharp. Telephone Conference set for 2/18/2014 at 9:30 AM. Counsel for plaintiff shall initiate this call. Signed by Magistrate Judge John S. Bryant on 5/21/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
|
May 15, 2013 |
Filing
23
ORDER granting 19 Motion for Leave to File Reply Brief. Signed by District Judge Kevin H. Sharp on 5/15/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
|
May 13, 2013 |
Filing
21
ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge E. Clifton Knowles recused. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge John S. Bryant for all further proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge E. Clifton Knowles on 5/13/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?