McMahon v. Metropolitan Government of Nashville and Davidson County, Tennessee

Plaintiff: Beverly D. McMahon
Defendant: Metropolitan Government of Nashville and Davidson County, Tennessee
Case Number: 3:2013cv00319
Filed: April 9, 2013
Court: Tennessee Middle District Court
Office: Nashville Office
County: Davidson
Presiding Judge: William J. Haynes
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12131 Americans with Disabilities Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 8, 2016 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting Report and Recommendations 42 ; denying 21 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; granting in part 24 Motion for Summary Judgment. Counsel has 30 days to submit an agreed order with a trial date. Signed by Senior Judge William J. Haynes, Jr on 3/8/16. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(af)
January 27, 2016 42 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: Accordingly, the Court respectfully RECOMMENDS that: 1) Plaintiff's motion for partial summary judgment (Docket Entry No. 21 ) be DENIED; 2) Defendant's motion for summary judgment (Docket Entry No. 24 ) be GR ANTED only to the extent that her allegations regarding her transfer back to the Lentz HC in September 2011, 2) the restrictions on her access to certain areas of the Lentz HC, and 3) the denial of her request for indefinite leave from work do not support discrete and individual claims of disability discrimination under the ADA as noted supra at Section IV(C)(3), and be DENIED in all other respects; and 3) this action be set for a trial by jury on all remaining claims. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 1/27/2016. (hb)
July 30, 2013 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: In accordance with the Memorandum filed herewith, the Defendant's motion for partial judgment on the pleadings (Docket Entry No. 7 ) is GRANTED and Plaintiff's state law claim for constructive discharge is DISMISSED with prejudice as time barred. It is so ORDERED. Signed by Chief Judge William J. Haynes, Jr on 7/30/13. (la) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/31/2013: # 1 Text Search Order) (la).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McMahon v. Metropolitan Government of Nashville and Davidson County, Tennessee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beverly D. McMahon
Represented By: August Carl Winter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Government of Nashville and Davidson County, Tennessee
Represented By: J. Brooks Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?