Akridge v. Finnegan et al

Plaintiff: Cortney Akridge
Defendant: Ryan Martin Finnegan, Ryan Potts and Jared Picchiottino
Case Number: 3:2013cv00588
Filed: June 14, 2013
Court: Tennessee Middle District Court
Office: Nashville Office
County: Davidson
Presiding Judge: William J. Haynes
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 11, 2015 86 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: For the reasons set out herein, the Court respectfully RECOMMENDS that: 1) Plaintiff's motion for partial summary judgment (Docket Entry No. 56 ) be DENIED; 2) Defendant's motion for summary judgment (Docket E ntry No. 53 ) be DENIED as to Count II and GRANTED as to Count III; 3) Count I of the amended complaint be DISMISSED pursuant to Plaintiffs request; and 4) this action be set for a jury trial on Count II of the amended complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 9/11/2015. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(hb)
March 19, 2014 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 49 Motion for Leave to Take Deposition. Signed by Chief Judge William J. Haynes, Jr on 3/19/14. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
November 4, 2013 42 Opinion or Order of the Court JOINT MODIFIED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Motion to Amend Pleadings due by 12/9/2013. Discovery due by 1/28/2014. Dispositive Motions due by 9/22/2014. Jury Trial reset for 1/27/2015 at 9:00 AM before Chief Judge William J. Haynes Jr. Pretrial Conference reset for 1/12/2015 at 3:00 PM before Chief Judge William J. Haynes Jr. Signed by Chief Judge William J. Haynes, Jr on 11/4/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
August 14, 2013 29 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 2: Jury Trial set for 9/16/2014 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom A859 before Chief Judge William J. Haynes Jr. Pretrial Conference set for 8/29/2014 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom A859 before Chief Judge William J. Haynes Jr. Signed by Chief Judge William J. Haynes, Jr on 8/14/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(la) Modified text on 8/14/2013 (la).
August 13, 2013 28 Opinion or Order of the Court INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Jury Trial set for 9/16/2014 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom A859 before Chief Judge William J. Haynes Jr. Pretrial Conference set for 8/29/2014 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom A859 before Chief Judge William J. Haynes Jr. Discov ery due by 3/7/2014. Dispositive motions due by 5/7/2014. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 8/29/2014. If this action is to be settled, the Law Clerk shall be notified by noon on 9/12/14. Signed by Chief Judge William J. Haynes, Jr on 8/13/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(la)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Akridge v. Finnegan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cortney Akridge
Represented By: R. Andrew Free
Represented By: Tricia Herzfeld
Represented By: Harry Elliott Ozment
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Martin Finnegan
Represented By: Keli J. Oliver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Potts
Represented By: Keli J. Oliver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jared Picchiottino
Represented By: Keli J. Oliver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?