Faulkner v. Corizon Health Care Corp et al
Plaintiff: |
David Chester Faulkner |
Defendant: |
Krystal (l/n/u), Lisa (l/n/u), (f/n/u) Reuben, Lisa Jack and f/n/u Alexander |
Case Number: |
3:2013cv00654 |
Filed: |
July 2, 2013 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee |
Office: |
Nashville Office |
County: |
Davidson |
Presiding Judge: |
Todd J. Campbell |
Presiding Judge: |
Juliet E. Griffin |
Nature of Suit: |
Prisoner: Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Jury Demanded By: |
Defendant |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
June 16, 2014 |
Filing
54
ORDER: The Report and Recommendation 51 is adopted and approved. Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment 43 is GRANTED, and this action is DISMISSED. Any other pending Motions are denied as moot, and the Clerk is directed to close the file. This Order shall constitute the final judgment in this case pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 58. Signed by District Judge Todd J. Campbell on 6/16/14. (xc:Pro se party by regular and certified mail.)(DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
|
November 14, 2013 |
Filing
31
ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS: Pending before the Court is a Report and Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge (Docket No. 24 ), to which no Objections have been filed. The Court has reviewed the Report and Recommendation and the file. The Report and Recommendation is adopted and approved. Accordingly, Plaintiff's Motion to Compel (Docket No. 14 ), which is actually a Motion for preliminary injunctive relief, is DENIED. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Todd J. Campbell on 11/14/2013. (xc:Pro se party by regular and certified mail.)(DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(hb)
|
October 24, 2013 |
Filing
24
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: The Court respectfully RECOMMENDS that the plaintiff's MOTION to Compel 14 be DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Juliet E. Griffin on 10/24/2013. (xc:Pro se party by regular and certified mail.)(DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(hb)
|
July 10, 2013 |
Filing
4
MEMORANDUM OF THE COURT. Signed by District Judge Todd J. Campbell on 7/10/13. (xc:Pro se party by regular and certified mail.)(DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(af)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?