Cline v. United States
Plaintiff: Kimberly Cline
Defendant: United States
Case Number: 3:2013cv00776
Filed: August 5, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Office: Nashville Office
County: Montgomery
Presiding Judge: Aleta A. Trauger
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1346 Tort Claim
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER granting motion to continue trial date. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 1/18/17. (af)
May 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 76 MEMORANDUM OPINION OF THE COURT. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 5/10/16. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am)
September 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: For the reasons stated herein, the government's motion to dismiss is GRANTED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. It is further ORDERED that the plaintiffs shall have a period of 14 days to amend the Complaint. It is so ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 9/18/2014. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(hb)
April 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: For the reasons stated herein, the United States' motion to dismiss is GRANTED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. It is further ORDERED that the plaintiffs shall have a period of 14 days to amend the Complaint. It is so ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 4/7/14. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(tmw)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cline v. United States
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Cline
Represented By: Amy C. Bates
Represented By: Lee W. Berry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?