Brown-Hudgins v. Social Security Administration et al
Plaintiff: Courtney Elizabeth Brown-Hudgins
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 3:2013cv00874
Filed: August 29, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Office: Nashville Office
County: Williamson
Presiding Judge: Joe Brown
Presiding Judge: John T. Nixon
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER finding as moot 25 Motion for Attorney Fees; granting 26 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Senior Judge John T. Nixon on 11/23/15. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(af)
September 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: For the reasons stated below, the Report (Doc. No. 20 ) is ADOPTED as modified below, Brown-Hudgins' Motion (Doc. No. 15 ) is GRANTED, and this case is REMANDED to the Commissioner for further proceedings. The Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to close the case. Signed by Senior Judge John T. Nixon on 9/23/2015. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(hb)
June 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 20 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 15 First MOTION for Judgment on the Record. The undersigned recommends that the plaintiff's motion for judgment on the record be GRANTED and her claim be REMANDED to the Commissioner for reconsideration. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe Brown on 6/24/2014. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(hb)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown-Hudgins v. Social Security Administration et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Courtney Elizabeth Brown-Hudgins
Represented By: David Clyde Downard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?