Driver v. Fabish et al
Plaintiff: De'Mario Driver
Defendant: Frank Fabish, Michael Ferrish, Jorge Santiago, James Lindsey, Earl Johnson, Quintez Burke, John Doe I and John Doe II
Case Number: 3:2013cv01087
Filed: October 4, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Office: Nashville Office
County: Davidson
Presiding Judge: John S. Bryant
Presiding Judge: Aleta A. Trauger
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 264 ORDER: The magistrate judge issued a Report and Recommendation ( 261 ), to which no timely objections have been filed. The Report and Recommendation is therefore ACCEPTED and made the findings of fact and conclusions of law of this court. It is hereb y ORDERED as follows: 1. The plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment against defendant Jorge Santiago ( 231 ) is GRANTED and default judgment is hereby entered against defendant Santiago in the amount of $20,000.00. 2. The plaintiff's Motion for an Award of Attorney's Fees ( 249 ) is GRANTED, and the plaintiff is awarded reasonable attorney's fees, to be paid by defendant Santiago, in the amount of $16,520.00. 3. The John Doe II defendant is DISMISSED from this case. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 4/17/18. (gb)
March 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 261 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: Based on the foregoing, the undersigned Magistrate Judge respectfully RECOMMENDS that: (1) Plaintiff's motion (Docket Entry No. 231) for default judgment against Defendant Jorge Santiago be GRANTED and that defa ult judgment be entered against Defendant Jorge Santiago in the amount of $20,000.00;. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 3/27/2018. (2) Plaintiff's motion for an award of attorneys fees (Docket Entry No. 249) be GRA NTED and that Plaintiff be awarded attorney's fees against Defendant Jorge Santiago in the amount of $16,520.00; (3) the "John Doe II" defendant be DISMISSED; and, (4) a final judgment be entered in this action in accordance with Rule 58 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail.) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(jw)
June 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 208 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: For the reasons set out herein, the undersigned Magistrate Judge respectfully RECOMMENDS that the motion to dismiss of Defendant Leslie Mitchell (Docket Entry No. 156) be GRANTED and that the claims against Defendant Mitchell be DISMISSED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 6/5/2017. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail. ) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(jw)
January 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 176 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: The undersigned RECOMMENDS that Driver's 155 Motion for default judgment against Defendants Santiago and Farrish be DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE to refiling after adjudication of his claims against the remaining defendants. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 1/31/2017. (xc:Pro se party by regular and certified mail.)(DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(jw)
August 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER granting 69 Motion for Relief from Order Based on Changed Circumstances. The Order entered July 29, 2014 (Docket Entry No. 61) is vacated to the extent that it required Plaintiff Driver, then appearing pro se, to complete and return service packet for Defendant Mitchell to the Clerk. Counsel has now appeared for Plaintiff. Signed by Magistrate Judge John S. Bryant on 8/19/2014. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(ds)
July 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER denying 58 Motion for Entry of Default. Signed by Keith Throckmorton, Clerk of Court on 7/31/2014. (xc:Pro se party by regular and certified mail.) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (ds)
July 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 62 SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 9/26/2014. Discovery due by 11/5/2014. Dispositive Motions due by 12/5/2014 - Responses due by 1/5/2015 - Replies due by 1/19/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge John S. Bryant on 7/28/2014. (xc:Pro se party by regular and certified mail.) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (ds)
April 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER: Plaintiff's requests 21 and 29 are GRANTED. Counsel for the served Defendants shall file under seal by April 25, 2014, the last known addresses for Defendants Fabish, Santiago and Lindsey. Upon the filing of these addresses, the Unite d States Marshals Service shall attempt service of process on these Defendants. Signed by Magistrate Judge John S. Bryant on 4/10/14. (xc:Pro se party by regular and certified mail.)(DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Driver v. Fabish et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: De'Mario Driver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank Fabish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Ferrish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jorge Santiago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Lindsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Earl Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quintez Burke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?