Tomasik et al v. Goins et al

Plaintiff: Libertarian Party of Tennessee, J. Daniel Tomasik and James Tomasik
Defendant: Mark Goins, Tre Hargett and Shelby County Election Commission
Case Number: 3:2013cv01118
Filed: October 9, 2013
Court: Tennessee Middle District Court
Office: Nashville Office
County: Davidson
Presiding Judge: William J. Haynes
Nature of Suit: Voting
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 27, 2014 Opinion or Order 42 ORDER granting 39 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Chief Judge William J. Haynes, Jr on 1/27/14. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(la)
October 25, 2013 Opinion or Order 18 ORDER: This Motion to Ascertain Status of Case 41 is Denied as moot. Signed by Chief Judge William J. Haynes, Jr on 10/25/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
October 24, 2013 Opinion or Order 15 ORDER: By order entered October 22, 2013 13 , this case was reassigned to the Honorable William J. Haynes, Jr., Chief Judge. Inasmuch as Chief Judge Haynes normally conducts his own case management, the initial case management conference scheduled , by notice issued contemporaneously with the filing of the complaint, on 11/25/2013, is CANCELLED, to be rescheduled as appropriate by further order. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, there will be no further proceedings before the Magistrate Judge in this case. Judge Magistrate Judge Juliet E. Griffin no longer assigned to case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Juliet E. Griffin on 10/24/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tomasik et al v. Goins et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Libertarian Party of Tennessee
Represented By: William Gary Blackburn
Represented By: James C. Linger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J. Daniel Tomasik
Represented By: James C. Linger
Represented By: William Gary Blackburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Tomasik
Represented By: James C. Linger
Represented By: William Gary Blackburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Goins
Represented By: Janet M. Kleinfelter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tre Hargett
Represented By: Janet M. Kleinfelter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shelby County Election Commission
Represented By: John L. Ryder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?