Guimaraes v. Bank of America Corporation, N.A.

Plaintiff: Nilo Guimaraes
Defendant: Bank of America Corporation, N.A.
Case Number: 3:2013cv01178
Filed: October 24, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Office: Nashville Office
County: Williamson
Presiding Judge: Todd J. Campbell
Presiding Judge: E. Clifton Knowles
Nature of Suit: Housing/Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42:3601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER: The Court is in receipt of a Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice 26 indicating the parties have settled this action. Accordingly, the Clerk is directed to close the file. The pretrial conference scheduled February 13, 2015, and the trial scheduled for February 24, 2015, are cancelled. This Order shall constitute the judgment in this case pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 58. Signed by District Judge Todd J. Campbell on 7/21/14. (dt)
April 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER: Pending before the Court is Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint (Docket No. 18). For the reasons stated in the accompanying Memorandum, Defendant's Motion is DENIED. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Todd J. Campbell on 4/14/14. (tmw)
December 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: Jury Trial set for 2/24/2015 at 9:00 AM before District Judge Todd J. Campbell. Pretrial Conference set for 2/13/2015 at 9:00 AM before District Judge Todd J. Campbell. Exhibit List and Witness List due by 2/6/2015. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 2/6/2015. Signed by District Judge Todd J. Campbell on 12/26/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
October 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: This case is Referred to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management. Discovery is not stayed absent order of the District Judge. This case shall be set for trial upon completion of the initial case management conference by order of the District Judge. Signed by District Judge Todd J. Campbell on 10/25/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Guimaraes v. Bank of America Corporation, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America Corporation, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nilo Guimaraes
Represented By: Todd G. Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?