Bankers Standard Insurance Company v. MTD (USA) Corporation et al
Plaintiff: |
Bankers Standard Insurance Company |
Defendant: |
Zhejiang Dingbo Plumbing Manufacturing Co., Ltd., MTD (USA) Corporation and Interline Brands, Inc. |
Case Number: |
3:2013cv01199 |
Filed: |
October 31, 2013 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee |
Office: |
Nashville Office |
County: |
Davidson |
Presiding Judge: |
Juliet E. Griffin |
Presiding Judge: |
John T. Nixon |
Nature of Suit: |
Property Damage Product Liability |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1332 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
August 1, 2014 |
Filing
28
ORDER setting deadlines. The Clerk is directed to forward the file to Chief Judge Haynes for all further proceedings in this case. Because Chief Judge Haynes normally conducts his own case management, unless otherwise directed by the Court, there will be no further proceedings before the Magistrate Judge in this case. It is so ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Juliet E. Griffin on 8/1/14. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(af)
|
July 9, 2014 |
Filing
27
ORDER OF RECUSAL. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 294(b), the undersigned is unable or unwilling to undertake this matter. Accordingly, I hereby RECUSE myself and return this case to the Clerk of Court for reassignment to another judge. Case reassigned to Chief Judge William J. Haynes, Jr. for all further proceedings. Signed by Senior Judge John T. Nixon on 7/8/2014. (ds)
|
July 7, 2014 |
Filing
26
ORDER: Telephone Conference RESET for 7/30/2014 at 12:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Juliet E. Griffin. Signed by Magistrate Judge Juliet E. Griffin on 7/7/2014. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(ds)
|
May 7, 2014 |
Filing
24
ORDER: Telephone Conference held on 5/7/2014. Motion to Compel discovery 20 is GRANTED to the extent that defendants MTD and Interline shall have until May 30, 2014, to serve responses to the interrogatories and requests for production served upon them on 12/19/2013. Counsel for the parties shall convene another telephone conference call with the Court on Thursday, 7/24/2014, at 12:00 noon, central time, to address whether defendant Dingbo has entered an appearance or has been served , what experts the parties anticipate, on what dates expert depositions have been scheduled, whether any dispositive motion will be filed, whether any additional parties are expected, whether any scheduling deadlines can or should be adjusted, and any other appropriate matters. Signed by Magistrate Judge Juliet E. Griffin on 5/7/14. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
|
March 27, 2014 |
Filing
21
ORDER granting 19 Motion for Extension of Time to serve process upon defendant Zhejiang Dingbo. Signed by Magistrate Judge Juliet E. Griffin on 3/27/14. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
|
December 18, 2013 |
Filing
18
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER #2: Telephone Conference set for 5/7/2014 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Juliet E. Griffin., Jury Trial set for 6/16/2015 at 9:00 AM before Senior Judge John T. Nixon. Pretrial Conference set for 6/5/2015 at 10:00 AM bef ore Senior Judge John T. Nixon. Exhibit List and Witness List due by 5/29/2015. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 5/29/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Juliet E. Griffin on 12/18/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?