Phillips v. Nationstar Mortgage, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Clayton James Phillips
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage, LLC, BAC Home Loans Servicing LP, Bank of America, N.A., Agency Mortgage Corporation, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., MERSCORP Holdings, Inc. and GMAC Mortgage Corporation
Case Number: 3:2013cv01414
Filed: December 16, 2013
Court: Tennessee Middle District Court
Office: Nashville Office
County: Sumner
Referring Judge: Juliet E. Griffin
Presiding Judge: John T. Nixon
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 17, 2016 48 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM signed by Chief Judge Kevin H. Sharp on 5/17/2016. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(hb)
September 2, 2014 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: On August 29, 2014, the plaintiff filed his first amended complaint 34 . As addressed during the initial case management conference held on and in the order entered August 15, 2014 33 , the defendants' motion to dismiss 26 is rendered MOOT, and the Clerk is directed to terminate that motion as pending. The defendant shall have until September 19, 2014, to file a motion to dismiss the plaintiff's first amended complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Juliet E. Griffin on 9/2/14. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
February 4, 2014 15 Opinion or Order of the Court INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Juliet E. Griffin on 2/4/14. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Phillips v. Nationstar Mortgage, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clayton James Phillips
Represented By: P. Robert Philp, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BAC Home Loans Servicing LP
Represented By: Harold Frederick Humbracht, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: Harold Frederick Humbracht, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Agency Mortgage Corporation
Represented By: Harold Frederick Humbracht, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Harold Frederick Humbracht, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MERSCORP Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Harold Frederick Humbracht, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GMAC Mortgage Corporation
Represented By: Harold Frederick Humbracht, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?