Davis et al v. Patel et al

Plaintiff: Michael Anthony Davis and Janice Carter Davis
Defendant: Samunka Patel, Pinal Patel and Manish Kumar Patel
Case Number: 3:2014cv00764
Filed: March 17, 2014
Court: Tennessee Middle District Court
Office: Nashville Office
County: Davidson
Referring Judge: Joe Brown
Presiding Judge: John T. Nixon
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 5, 2016 75 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 8/5/2016. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(hb)
May 22, 2015 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING IN PART 43 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: The Court ADOPTS in part the Report and Recommendation that Plaintiffs are not entitled to enterprise coverage under the FLSA, do not produce goods for interstate commerce, and are not engaged in commerce when performing housekeeping and maintenance duties. Yet, because the Court concludes that a genuine issue of material fact exists as to whether Plaintiffs' front desk activities qualify them as engaged in commerce, Defendants' motion for summary judgment (Docket Entry No. 20 ) is DENIED. It is so ORDERED. Signed by Senior Judge William J. Haynes, Jr on 5/21/2015. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(hb)
March 12, 2015 43 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: The Magistrate Judge RECOMMENDS that Defendants' motion for summary judgment (Doc. 20 ) be GRANTED. Signed by Senior Judge William J. Haynes, Jr on 3/12/2015. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(hb)
May 28, 2014 12 Opinion or Order of the Court INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe Brown on 5/28/14. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis et al v. Patel et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Anthony Davis
Represented By: Stephen W. Grace
Represented By: Kerry E. Knox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janice Carter Davis
Represented By: Stephen W. Grace
Represented By: Kerry E. Knox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samunka Patel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pinal Patel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manish Kumar Patel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?