Music City Metals Co., Inc. v. Lucas BBQ Co. Ltd. et al
Plaintiff: |
Music City Metals Co., Inc. |
Defendant: |
Lucas BBQ Co. Ltd., Grill Town Enterprises, Inc. and BBQTek Enterprise, Inc. |
Case Number: |
3:2014cv00834 |
Filed: |
March 24, 2014 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee |
Office: |
Nashville Office |
County: |
Davidson |
Presiding Judge: |
Todd J. Campbell |
Presiding Judge: |
Juliet E. Griffin |
Nature of Suit: |
Trademark |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1331 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
August 31, 2015 |
Filing
36
ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: Pending before the Court is a Report and Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge (Docket No. 35 ), to which no Objections have been filed. The Court has reviewed the Report and Recommendation and the file. The Report and Recommendation is adopted and approved. Accordingly, Plaintiff's Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Non-Taxable Expenses (Docket No. 32 ) is GRANTED, and the Plaintiff is awarded a total of $30,763.24 in attorneys' fees and nontaxable expenses. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Todd J. Campbell on 8/31/2015. (hb)
|
August 11, 2015 |
Filing
35
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 32 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Non-Taxable Expenses filed by Music City Metals Co., Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 8/11/2015. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(hb)
|
September 2, 2014 |
Filing
21
ORDER: The initial case management conference was rescheduled to August 27, 2014, at which time no appearance was entered on behalf of the defendants. Inasmuch as the defendants have not filed a response to the complaint, the Clerk has entered defa ult against the defendants, the defendants did not appear at the initial case management conference on August 27, 2014, and the defendants have not communicated with the Court in any form or fashion, unless otherwise directed by the Court, there w ill be no further proceedings before the Magistrate Judge in this case. Judge Magistrate Judge Juliet E. Griffin no longer assigned to case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Juliet E. Griffin on 9/2/14. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
|
July 18, 2014 |
Filing
17
ENTRY OF DEFAULT: Pending are Plaintiff's Motions for Entry of Default against Defendants Lucas City BBQ Co., Ltd., BBQTek Enterprise, Inc., and Grill Town Enterprises, Inc. (Docket Entries 14, 15 & 16). Plaintiff has provided confirmation fr om the U.S. Postal Service showing that summonses were served in Canada and Defendants have not responded within the time period permitted by law. Accordingly, the Clerk hereby enters default against the defendants. Signed by Clerk of Court, Keith Throckmorton on 7/18/14. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt) Modified on 7/18/2014 (dt).
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?