October 11, 2018 |
Filing
385
MEMORANDUM OPINION OF THE COURT: For the foregoing reasons, Plaintiff's Motion in Limine is granted in part to exclude references to the nature and details of Plaintiff's convictions, and denied in part as to disclosure of Plaintiff' s term of sentence, number of convictions, or status as a felon. (Dkt. No. 330.) Defendant's Motion in Limine Nos. 1, 2, 3, 5, 7, and 9 are granted. (Dkt. Nos. 331, 332, 333, 335, 337, 339.) Defendant's Motion in Limine No. 4 is granted in part to exclude out-of-court statements or documents relating to Dr. Coble, CoreCivic, SCCF, or other hospitals, and taken under advisement in part if such statements become relevant for impeachment. (Dkt. No. 334.) Defendant's Motion in Limine No. 6 is granted in part to exclude comparisons between Plaintiff's medical care from Defendant and from other providers. (Dkt. No. 336.) It is denied in part insofar as Plaintiff may show care from others within Defendant's knowledge or re late his experiences with Defendant at the pill-call window. (Id.) Defendant's Motion in Limine No. 8 is taken under advisement. (Dkt. No. 338.) Defendant's motion to bifurcate trial is granted in part and denied in part. (Dkt. No. 356.) Th e jury shall determine liability, availability and amount of compensatory damages, and availability of punitive damages in the first phase and, if necessary, amount of punitive damages in the second phase. Plaintiff may refer to punitive damages i n the first phase, and the only evidence excluded from the first phase shall be evidence of Defendant's financial condition. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Marvin E. Aspen on 10/11/18. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(af)
|
July 18, 2017 |
Filing
309
MEMORANDUM OPINION OF THE COURT. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 7/18/2017. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail. ) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(eh)
|
March 2, 2017 |
Filing
284
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: The Magistrate Judge RECOMMENDS that: 1) the motions for summary judgment filed by Dr. Coble, NP Martin, and Nurse Orton (Docs. 218, 223) be GRANTED; 2) all federal law claims against Dr. Coble, NP Martin, and Nurse Orton be DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE; 3) the district court DECLINE TO EXERCISE SUPPLEMENTAL JURISDICTION over plaintiff's state law claims against Dr. Coble, NP Martin and Nurse Orton; 4) plaintiff's state law claims be DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDI CEto whatever relief plaintiff may be entitled in state court; 5) acceptance and adoption of this R&R constitute the FINAL JUDGMENT in this action; 6) any appeal NOT BE CERTIFIED as taken in good faith pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3). Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe Brown on 3/2/2017. (xc:Pro se party by regular and certified mail.)(DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(eh)
|
January 27, 2016 |
Filing
206
ORDER setting out new deadlines for the case. (xc:Pro se party by regular and certified mail.)(DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(Brown, Joe)
|
December 31, 2015 |
Filing
193
MEMORANDUM OPINION OF THE COURT. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 12/31/2015. (xc:Pro se party by regular and certified mail.)(DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(eh)
|
October 15, 2015 |
Filing
181
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: The Magistrate Judge RECOMMENDS that plaintiff's motion for relief from judgment under Rule 60(b)(1) & (6), Fed. R. Civ. P. (Doc. 174) be DENIED, and that all other pending motions in this action be terminated as MOOT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe Brown on 10/15/2015. (xc:Pro se party by regular and certified mail.)(DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(eh)
|
September 10, 2015 |
Filing
168
ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS: The Report and Recommendation is therefore ACCEPTED and made the findings of fact and conclusions of law of this court. For the reasons expressed therein, the following are hereby ORDERED: 1. The Motion fo r Judgment Upon the Pleadings filed by Defendants Damon Hiniger and Dr. Jose Garriga (DE # 106 ) is GRANTED; 2. All federal claims against all defendants are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE; 3. The District Court declines to exercise supplemental jurisdicti on over the Plaintiff's state law claims; 4. This case is dismissed without prejudice as to whatever relief to which the Plaintiff may be entitled in state court on his state law claims; 5. This Order constitutes the final judgment in this case ; 6. All pending motions are hereby terminated as moot. It is so ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 9/10/2015. (xc:Pro se party by regular and certified mail.)(DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(eh)
|
June 9, 2015 |
Filing
145
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: The Magistrate Judge RECOMMENDS that: 1) the motion for judgment on the pleadings (Doc. 106) be GRANTED; 2) all federal law claims be DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE as to all defendants; 3) the district court DECLINE TO EXERCISE SUPPLEMENTAL JURISDICTION over plaintiff's state law claims; 4) this case be DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE as to whatever relief plaintiff may be entitled in state court on his state law claims; 5) acceptance and adoption of this Report and Rec ommendation (R&R) constitute the FINAL JUDGMENT in this action; 6) all pending motions be terminated as MOOT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe Brown on 6/9/2015. (xc:Pro se party by regular and certified mail.)(DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(eh)
|
October 29, 2014 |
Filing
82
ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS: On September 17, 2014, the Magistrate Judge issued a Report and Recommendation (R&R) (Docket No. 65) on the plaintiff's motions for a preliminary injunction and temporary restraining order (TRO) filed on May 28, 2014 (Docket No. 11 ) and on June 23, 2014 (Docket No. 18 ), as well as the plaintiff's motion for appointment of counsel (Docket No. 51 ), recommending that all motions be denied. Now pending before the court are Objections to the R&R timely filed by the plaintiff (Docket No. 72) and a response filed by the defendants (Docket No. 79). For the reasons explained more fully in the Memorandum entered contemporaneously herewith, the court finds that the plaintiff's Obj ections lack merit. The court agrees with the Magistrate Judge's analysis and recommendation, finding that the plaintiff is not entitled to the issuance of a preliminary injunction or TRO, or to the appointment of counsel. Therefore, the plaintiff's Objections are OVERRULED. It is so ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 10/29/2014. (xc:Pro se party by regular and certified mail.)(eh)
|
September 17, 2014 |
Filing
65
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: The Magistrate Judge recommends that plaintiff's motions (Docs. 11, 18, 51) be DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe Brown on 9/17/2014. (xc:Pro se party by regular and certified mail.)(DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(eh) Modified on 9/17/2014 (eh).
|
June 2, 2014 |
Filing
15
ORDER denying 12 Motion for Delay of Service of Defendant Susan Martin. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe Brown on 6/2/14. (xc:Pro se party by regular and certified mail.)(DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
|