Rainey et al v. Binkley et al

Defendant: Timothy D. Binkley and Penny Binkley
Plaintiff: Sarah Rainey and Philip Rainey
Case Number: 3:2014cv00967
Filed: April 10, 2014
Court: Tennessee Middle District Court
Office: Nashville Office
County: Cheatham
Referring Judge: E. Clifton Knowles
Presiding Judge: John T. Nixon
Nature of Suit: All Other Real Property
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 23, 2014 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Jury Trial set for 9/29/2015 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom A859 before Chief Judge William J. Haynes Jr., Pretrial Conference set for 9/14/2015 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom A859 before Chief Judge William J. Haynes Jr.. Signed by Chief Judge William J. Haynes, Jr on 9/23/14. (afs)
July 31, 2014 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: This action has been reassigned to the Honorable William J. Haynes, Jr., upon the recusal of the Honorable John T. Nixon 12 . The Initial Case Management Conference was held on June 9, 2014, and the Order was entered the same day 10 . A review of the docket shows no pending motions. Absent further orders, there will be no further proceedings before the undersigned. Signed by Magistrate Judge E. Clifton Knowles on 7/31/14. (dt)
June 9, 2014 10 Opinion or Order of the Court INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Motion to Amend Pleadings due by 9/30/2014. Discovery due by 9/30/2014. Dispositive Motions due by 3/30/2015. Jury Trial set for 9/15/2015 before Senior Judge John T. Nixon. Pretrial Conference set for 9/4/2015 10:00 AM before Senior Judge John T. Nixon. Signed by Magistrate Judge E. Clifton Knowles on 6/9/14. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rainey et al v. Binkley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy D. Binkley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Penny Binkley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah Rainey
Represented By: Mark T. Freeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Philip Rainey
Represented By: Mark T. Freeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?