Bostic v. Biggs et al
Plaintiff: |
James E. Bostic |
Defendant: |
Shara Biggs, Mental Health Cooperative, Inc., Ensley Dawson, Amber (l/n/u) and Metro Sheriff's Office |
Case Number: |
3:2014cv01068 |
Filed: |
April 25, 2014 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee |
Office: |
Nashville Office |
County: |
Davidson |
Presiding Judge: |
John S. Bryant |
Presiding Judge: |
Aleta A. Trauger |
Nature of Suit: |
Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1441 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Defendant |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
February 15, 2017 |
Filing
178
ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS: The plaintiff's objections are OVERRULED and the Report and Recommendation is hereby ACCEPTED and made the findings of fact and conclusions of law of this court. For the reasons expressed therein, it i s hereby ORDERED that defendant Metro's Motion to Remand (Docket No. 128 ) is GRANTED, and this case is remanded to the Circuit Court for Davidson County, Tennessee, from whence it was removed. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 2/15/2017.(xc:Pro se party by regular and certified mail. Circuit Court by regular mail)(DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(eh)
|
January 13, 2017 |
Filing
169
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: The Magistrate Judge RECOMMENDS that Metro Governments Motion to Remand (Doc. No. 128) be GRANTED and the action be remanded to the Circuit Court for Davidson County, Tennessee. The Magistrate Judge also recommends that Metro Governments Motion to Dismiss (Doc. No. 105) be DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 1/13/2017. (xc:Pro se party by regular and certified mail.)(eh)
|
September 9, 2016 |
Filing
153
ORDER: For these reasons, it is hereby ORDERED that the Report and Recommendation is ACCEPTED and made the findings of fact and conclusions of law of this court. For the reasons expressed therein, it is hereby ORDERED that the plaintiff's sec ond Motion to Amend his complaint (Docket No. 74) is DENIED. This case is returned to the magistrate judge for further handling under the originalreferral order. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 9/8/16. (xc:Pro se party by regular and certified mail.)(DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(af)
|
August 8, 2016 |
Filing
131
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: The undersigned recommends that Plaintiffs motion to add new defendants and assert supplemental claims (Docket Entry No. 74) should be denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge John S. Bryant on 8/8/2016. (xc:Pro se party by regular and certified mail.)(DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(eh)
|
May 20, 2015 |
Filing
62
ORDER denying 61 Motion for Entry of Default. Signed by Clerk of Court on 5/20/2015. (xc: Pro se party by regular and certified mail.) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(ds)
|
July 28, 2014 |
Filing
15
ORDER: Jury Trial set for 7/7/2015 at 9:00 AM before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. It is further ORDERED that the Magistrate Judge shall conduct the pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order. He shall assist the plaintiff with the prepa ration of subpoenas, discuss exhibits, instructions and all other matters necessary for having the case prepared to be tried on the date set. If he considers it appropriate to appoint counsel to represent the plaintiff at trial, he should do so. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 7/25/2014. (xc:Pro se party by regular and certified mail.) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (ds)
|
July 24, 2014 |
Filing
13
SCHEDULING ORDER: Motion to Amend Pleadings due by 9/22/2014. Discovery due by 11/21/2014. Dispositive Motions due by 12/22/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge John S. Bryant on 7/24/14. (xc:Pro se party by regular and certified mail.)(DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
|
June 25, 2014 |
Filing
10
DENIAL OF ENTRY OF DEFAULT. Signed by Keith Throckmorton, Clerk of Court, on 6/25/14. (xc:Pro se party by regular and certified mail.)(DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(tmw)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?