Tennessee Nitrate Technology, Inc. v. Kay & Kay Contracting, LLC et al
Plaintiff: |
Tennessee Nitrate Technology, Inc. |
Defendant: |
Great American Insurance Company and Kay & Kay Contracting, LLC |
Counter_plaintiff: |
Kay & Kay Contracting, LLC and Great American Insurance Company |
Counter_defendant: |
Tennessee Nitrate Technology, Inc. |
Case Number: |
3:2014cv01268 |
Filed: |
June 5, 2014 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee |
Office: |
Nashville Office |
County: |
Davidson |
Presiding Judge: |
John S. Bryant |
Presiding Judge: |
Todd J. Campbell |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Contract |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1441 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
August 19, 2014 |
Filing
28
ORDER: The undersigned Magistrate Judge has spoken with Magistrate Judge Cliff Knowles, and Judge Knowles has agreed to conduct a settlement conference with the parties. Counsel are directed to telephone Judge Knowles's courtroom deputy to select a suitable date for this conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge John S. Bryant on 8/19/2014. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (ds)
|
July 30, 2014 |
Filing
23
ORDER: The initial case management conference currently scheduled for August 4, 2014 is CANCELED, to be rescheduled after the parties have chosen a suitable date to conduct a judicial settlement conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge John S. Bryant on 7/30/2014. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(ds)
|
July 23, 2014 |
Filing
19
ORDER: Telephone Conference set for 7/30/2014 at 9:30 AM to discuss a suitable date for the settlement conference. The parties shall call the Magistrate Judge's conference line of (615) 695-2857 in order to participate in this telephone conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge John S. Bryant on 7/23/14. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
|
June 16, 2014 |
Filing
16
ORDER granting 14 Motion for Judicial Settlement Conference. The case is referred to the Magistrate Judge for the parties to participate in alternative dispute resolution, pursuant to Rules 16.02 - 16.08 of the Local Rules of Court. The Magistr ate Judge shall issue all necessary orders to implement the type of alternative dispute resolution he selects as appropriate. Signed by District Judge Todd J. Campbell on 6/16/14. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
|
June 6, 2014 |
Filing
9
ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management. Discovery is not stayed absent order of the District Judge. This case shall be set for trial upon completion of the initial case management conference by order of the District Judge. Signed by District Judge Todd J. Campbell on 6/6/14. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?