Osborne-Moore v. Social Security Administration et al
Plaintiff: |
Melanie F. Osborne-Moore |
Defendant: |
Social Security Administration and SSA-Email Notification |
Case Number: |
3:2014cv01309 |
Filed: |
June 16, 2014 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee |
Office: |
Nashville Office |
County: |
Davidson |
Presiding Judge: |
Joe Brown |
Presiding Judge: |
Todd J. Campbell |
Nature of Suit: |
Supplemental Security Income |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 205 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
May 26, 2015 |
Filing
22
ORDER: Pending before the Court is a Report and Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge (Docket No. 18), to which no Objections have been filed. The Court has reviewed the Report and Recommendation and the file. The Report and Recommendation is ad opted and approved. Accordingly, for the reasons stated in the Report and Recommendation, Plaintiff's Motion for Judgment on the Administrative Record (Docket No. 16) is DENIED, and the decision of the Defendant is affirmed. The Clerk is directed to close this file. This Order shall constitute the final judgment in this case. Signed by District Judge Todd J. Campbell on 5/26/2015. (xc: Pro se party by regular and certified mail) (ds)
|
May 4, 2015 |
Filing
18
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 16 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings: The Magistrate Judge RECOMMENDS that Plaintiff's Motion for Judgment on the Administrative Record (Docket Entry 16) be DENIED, and the Commissioner's decision be AFFIRMED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe Brown on 5/4/2015. (xc: Pro se party by regular and certified mail.) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (ds)
|
August 26, 2014 |
Filing
13
ORDER: To facilitate review of the administrative decision, the plaintiff is directed to file a motion for judgment on the administrative record supported by a brief within thirty (30) days of entry of this order. The defendant shall, within twenty -eight (28) days of service of the plaintiff's brief, file a brief in response. The plaintiff has fourteen (14) days after service ofthe defendant's response to file a reply brief. Neither party is required to file motions for summary judgment or Social Security Appeal Fact forms. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe Brown on 8/26/2014. (xc: Pro se party by regular and certified mail.) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (ds)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?