Russell et al v. Richardson et al
Plaintiff: |
Ed Russell |
Defendant: |
James A. Richardson, Jr. and Joe Mitchell |
Case Number: |
3:2014cv01555 |
Filed: |
July 29, 2014 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee |
Office: |
Nashville Office |
County: |
Davidson |
Presiding Judge: |
Joe Brown |
Presiding Judge: |
Aleta A. Trauger |
Nature of Suit: |
Copyrights |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1338 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
August 12, 2016 |
Filing
181
ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: The court hereby ACCEPTS the Report and Recommendation 152 and makes it the findings of fact and conclusions of law of this court. For the reasons expressed therein, it is hereby ORDERED that defendant R ichardson's Motion to Dismiss (Docket No. 131 ) is DENIED and defendant Richardson's Motion for Relief From Order (Docket No. 135 ) is DENIED. It is further ORDERED that the plaintiff's Motion to Correct Application for Leave to Pr oceed In forma Pauperis (Docket No. 144 ) is GRANTED, in so far as the application may be amended, but it is DENIED in so far as the plaintiff seeks to proceed in forma pauperis. This case shall be returned to the magistrate judge for further han dling under the original referral order. It is so ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 8/11/2016. (xc:Pro se party by regular and certified mail.)(DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(hb) Modified text on 8/12/2016 (hb).
|
December 29, 2015 |
Filing
110
ORDER rejecting 104 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. For the reasons expressed herein, the Report and Recommendation is REJECTED, and this case is returned to the magistrate judge for further handling under the original referral order. It is so ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 12/29/2015. (xc:Pro se party by regular and certified mail.)(DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(hb)
|
February 19, 2015 |
Filing
79
ORDER: The Report and Recommendation 72 is therefore ACCEPTED and made the findings of fact and conclusions of law of this court. For the reasons expressed therein, it is hereby ORDERED that the following motions 10 , 15 , 18 , 24 , 46 and 67 are DENIED without prejudice. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 2/19/15. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?