Wiggins v. Metropolitan Government of Nashville-Davidson County, Tennessee et al
Plaintiff: Jerald Wiggins
Defendant: Metropolitan Government of Nashville-Davidson County, Tennessee, Kevin Crotts, Matthew Norris, James Dunaway, William Hampton, Keith McNamara, Tim Brewer and Logan's Roadhouse, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2014cv01950
Filed: October 6, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Office: Nashville Office
County: Davidson
Presiding Judge: William J. Haynes
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER: Wiggins' Objections (Doc. No. 101 ) are SUSTAINED IN PART AND OVERRULED IN PART. Granting 59 Partial Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim.; Granting 68 Partial Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim.; Gra nting 71 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim.; Granting 75 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim.; Granting 79 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim.; Adopting 99 Report and Recommendation. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 11/14/17. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(afs)
March 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 108 MEMORANDUM OPINION OF THE COURT. Signed by Senior Judge William J. Haynes, Jr on 3/24/2016. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(eh)
November 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 99 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: The undersigned recommends that: (1) Defendant Norris'Partial Motion to Dismiss (Docket No. 59) be GRANTED, and that Plaintiff's unlawful detention/false arrest claim and conspiracy claims against him be DISMISS ED; (2) DefendantLogan's Motion to Dismiss (Docket No. 62) be GRANTED, and that Plaintiff's claims against it be DISMISSED; (3) Defendant Kevin Crotts' Motion for a Partial Dismissal of Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint (Dock et No. 68) be GRANTED as to Plaintiff's unlawful detention / false arrest claim and conspiracy claims, and that those claims against him be DISMISSED, but DENIED AS MOOT with regard to Counts I, III, V, and VIII, as those claims are not asser ted against him; (4) Defendants Tim Brewer, William Hampton, and James Dunaway's Motion to Dismiss (Docket No. 71) be GRANTED, and that Plaintiffs claims against them be DISMISSED; (5) Defendant Metro Govt.'s Motion to Dismiss (Docket No. 75) be GRANTED, and that Plaintiff's claims against it be DISMISSED; and (6) Defendant Keith McNamara's Motion to Dismiss (Docket No. 79) be GRANTED, and that Plaintiff's claims against him be DISMISSED. Signed by Magistrate Judge E. Clifton Knowles on 11/25/2015. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(eh)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wiggins v. Metropolitan Government of Nashville-Davidson County, Tennessee et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerald Wiggins
Represented By: Jerry Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Government of Nashville-Davidson County, Tennessee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Crotts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Norris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Dunaway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Hampton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith McNamara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tim Brewer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Logan's Roadhouse, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?