Cunningham v. Trans Union et al
Plaintiff: |
Craig Cunningham |
Defendant: |
Trans Union, Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC and Chase |
Case Number: |
3:2014cv02410 |
Filed: |
December 31, 2014 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee |
Office: |
Nashville Office |
County: |
Davidson |
Presiding Judge: |
Joe Brown |
Presiding Judge: |
Aleta A. Trauger |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Statutory Actions |
Cause of Action: |
47 U.S.C. § 227 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
September 10, 2015 |
Filing
112
ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS: On August 3, 2015, the Magistrate Judge issued a Report and Recommendation (DE #106), to which no timely objections have been filed. The Report and Recommendation is therefore ACCEPTED and made the finding s of fact and conclusions of law of this court. For the reasons expressed therein, the following are hereby ORDERED: 1. The plaintiff's motion to stay pending the completion of discovery (DE # 75 ) is DENIED; 2. The Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank N.A. (DE # 23 ) is GRANTED; 3. The Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendant Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC (DE # 26 ) is GRANTED; and 4. The Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Defendant Trans Union, LLC (DE # 62 ) is DENIED AS MOOT, in light of the settlement between the plaintiff and this defendant (DE #109). This order constitutes the judgment in this case. It is so ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 9/10/2015. (xc:Pro se party by regular and certified mail.)(eh)
|
August 3, 2015 |
Filing
106
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: The Magistrate Judge RECOMMENDS that Plaintiff's Motion to Stay (Doc. 75) be DENIED; and that Defendant Chase's Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 23) be GRANTED; that Defendant Ocwen's Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 26) be G RANTED; and that Defendant Trans Union's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings (Doc. 62) be GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe Brown on 8/3/2015. (xc:Pro se party by regular and certified mail.)(DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(eh)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?