The Hospital Authority of Metropolitan Government of Nashville and Davidson county, Tennessee v. Momenta Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: The Hospital Authority of Metropolitan Government of Nashville and Davidson County, Tennessee
Defendant: Momenta Pharmaceuticals, Inc. and Sandoz, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2015cv01100
Filed: October 14, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Office: Nashville Office
County: Davidson
Presiding Judge: Barbara D. Holmes
Presiding Judge: William J. Haynes
Nature of Suit: Antitrust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 462 MEMORANDUM OPINION OF THE COURT. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 10/21/2019. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(jm)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 427 ORDER: For the reasons stated in the accompanying Memorandum Opinion, Plaintiffs' Renewed Motion for Class Certification and Appointment of Class Counsel 349 is GRANTED and Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Report and Opinions of Plain tiffs' Expert Dr. Russell L. Lamb 360 is DENIED. The Class will be defined as set forth in the Memorandum Opinion. NGH and DC 37 SHALL serve as Class Representative and Lieff Cabraser SHALL serve as Class Counsel. The case is hereby RETURNED to the Magistrate Judge for further case management. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 9/20/2019. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(hb)
December 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 253 MEMORANDUM OPINION OF THE COURT signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 12/5/2018. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(jm) (Main Document 253 replaced on 12/6/2018) (jm). Modified on 12/6/2018 (jm).
December 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 186 ORDER: Based on the foregoing, Plaintiff's motion for leave to file an amended complaint (DE 140 ) is GRANTED, with the additional allegations described in Plaintiffs notice filed on September 15, 2017 (DE 159 ), and the additional mod ification that Plaintiff specify the state laws under which it asserts its unjust enrichment claims. Plaintiff shall file this amended complaint within seven (7) days of the date of entry of this Order. Defendant shall have 28 days after the filing of the amended complaint to answer or otherwise respond Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 12/14/17. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(afs)
March 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER: Defendants' Motions for Leave to File a Reply (Doc. Nos. 12526) are hereby GRANTED. Based on the parties' briefing and a de novo review of the record, Sections I, II.A, II.B(2), II.B(3), and II.C of the Report and Recommendation o f the Magistrate Judge (Doc. No. 114) are hereby ADOPTED. Defendants' joint Motion to Transfer (Doc. No. 58) and Defendant Momenta Pharmaceuticals, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss or Transfer for Improper Venue (Doc. No. 62) are DENIED. For the reasons set forth in the accompanying Memorandum Opinion, Defendants' joint Motion to Dismiss (Doc. No. 65) is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Plaintiff's claims for damages are DISMISSED. Plaintiff's claims for injunctive and declaratory relief remain pending. Signed by District Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 3/21/17. (am)
September 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 114 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: The Magistrate Judge recommends that: (1) Defendants' Motion to Transfer Case to the District of Massachusetts (DE 58) be DENIED; (2) Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (DE 65) be DENIED; and (3) Defendant Momenta Pharmaceuticals, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss or Transfer for Improper Venue (DE 62) be DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 9/29/2016. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(eh)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Hospital Authority of Metropolitan Government of Nashville and Davidson county, Tennessee v. Momenta Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Hospital Authority of Metropolitan Government of Nashville and Davidson County, Tennessee
Represented By: Mark P. Chalos
Represented By: Brendan P. Glackin
Represented By: Dean M. Harvey
Represented By: Katherine C. Lubin
Represented By: John Tate Spragens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Momenta Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Robert M. Buchanan, Jr.
Represented By: Robert S. Frank, Jr.
Represented By: Robert Dale Grimes
Represented By: Irene Oberman Khagi
Represented By: Clark D. Milner
Represented By: Diane C. Seol
Represented By: Sophie F. Wang
Represented By: Daniel C. Winston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandoz, Inc.
Represented By: Teresa T. Bonder
Represented By: Liz Broadway Brown
Represented By: Andrew Hatchett
Represented By: Michael P. Kenny
Represented By: Matthew Kent
Represented By: Timothy L. Warnock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?