Kukoyi ex rel., et al. v. SavaSeniorCare, LLC., et al
Plaintiff: United States of America and Tramell Kukoyi
Defendant: Cedarwood Health Care Center, SSC Waynesville Operating Company, L.L.C., Minnequa Medicenter, Fairview Health and Rehabilitation Center, Bethesda Health and Rehabilitation Center, SSC Kenansville Operating Company, L.L.C., Pearl Street Health and Rehabilitation Center, Brazosview Healthcare Center, Overlea Health and Rehabilitation Center, SSC Windsor Operating Company, L.L.C., SSC Laredo West Operating Company, L.P., Aspen Living Center, SSC Richmond Operating Company, L.P., Four Corners Health Care Center, Glen Burnie Health and Rehabilitation Center, SSC Houston Woodwind Operating GP, L.L.C., SSC SubMaster Holdings, LLC, Alpine Living Center, SSC, SSC Kountze Operating Company, L.P., SavaSeniorCare Administrative Services, LLC, Patuxent River Health and Rehabilitation Center, Bastrop Nursing Center, SSC Hertford Operating Company, L.L.C., Pine Arbor, North Arundel Health and Rehabilitation Center, The Meadows Health and Rehabilitation Center, Brian Center Health & Retirement / Winston Salem, SSC Colorado Springs Colonial Columns Operating Company, L.L.C., SSC Hickory 13th Operating Company, L.L.C., Centennial Healthcare Center, Hillview Manor, SSC Statesville Maple Leaf Operating Company, L.L.C., Colonial Columns Nursing Center, Interlochen Health and Rehabilitation Center, SSC Weaverville Operating Company, L.L.C., SSC Fort Collins Lemay Avenue Operating Company, L.L.C., Ashland Health and Rehabilitation Center, SSC Pampa Operating Company, L.P., Heritage Harbour Health and Rehabilitation Center, SSC Waco Lakeshore Village Operating Company, L.P., SSC Alvin Operating Company, L.P., SSC Atlanta Operating Company, L.L.C., Kenton Manor, Kenansville Health and Rehabilitation Center, SSC Alice Operating Company, L.P., SSC Equity Holdings, LLC, SSC Montrose San Juan Operating Company, L.L.C., Sweeny House, Deer Creek of Wimberley, SSC Palisade Operating Company, L.L.C., SSC Hickory East Operating Company, L.L.C., Anderson Mill Health and Rehabilitation Center, SSC Odin Operating Company, L.L.C., SSC Pasadena Vista Operating Company, L.P., SSC Pleasanton South Operating Company, L.P., San Juan Living Center, Retama Manor Nursing Center / Alice, SSC San Antonio Northgate Operating Comapny, L.P., SSC Harris Village, L.P., Nature Trail Health Care Center, Hope Healthcare Center, SSC Brookhaven Operating Company, L.L.C., SSC Newport Beach Operating Company, L.P., SSC Sterling Operating Company, L.L.C., Diamond Ridge HealthCare Center, Northgate Health and Rehabilitation Center, SSC Ashland Operating Company, L.L.C., SSC Wallace Operating Company, L.L.C., Retama Manor Nursing Center / Corpus Christi North, Thorton Operating Company L.L.C., Retama Manor Nursing Center / Jourdanton, Cambridge East Healthcare Center, SSC Denver Red Rocks Operating Company, L.L.C., SSC Laurel Operating Company, L.L.C, La Paloma Nursing Center, SSC Carmichael Operating Company, L.P., SSC GlenBurnie North Arundel Operating Company, L.L.C., SSC Montgomery Cedar Crest Operating Company, L.L.C., SSC Beverly Hills Operating Company, L.L.C., SSC Eden Operating Company, L.L.C., SSC McAllen Las Palmas Operating Company, L.P., SSC Sumter East Operating Company, L.L.C., SSC Salisbury Operating Company, L.L.C., Pampa Nursing Center, Belmont Lodge Health Care Center, Memorial City Health and Rehabilitation Center, Retama Manor Nursing Center / Edinburgh, SSC Canton Operating Company, L.L.C., SSC Wilmington Operating Company, L.L.C, SSC Superior Township Operating Company, L.L.C., SSC McKinney Operating Company, L.P., Leonard Grunstein, Flagship Healthcare Center, Brian Center Health & Rehabilitation / Wilson, SSC Monroe Operating Company, L.L.C., SSC Colorado Springs Terrace Gardens Operating Company, L.L.C., Brian Center Health and Rehabilitation Hickory Viewmont, SSC Newport Operating Company, L.L.C., Northeast Atlanta Health and Rehabilitation Center, Woodwind Lakes Health & Rehabilitation Center, Tarzana Health and Rehabilitation Center, Retama Manor Nursing Center Raymondville, SSC Oakland Excell Operating Company, L.P., SSC Annapolis Operating Company, L.L.C., SSC Bel Air Operating Company, L.L.C., Brian Center Health & Rehabilitation / Weaverville, SSC Edinburgh Operating Company, L.P., Superior Woods Healthcare Center, Pasadena Care Center, Hilltop Village Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, Bangs Nursing Company, Jewell Care Center of Denver, SSC Houston Westbury Place Operating Company, L.P., Sierra Vista Health Care Center, SSC Fort Worth Nursing & Rehabilitation Center Operating Company, L.P., Pendleton Health and Rehabilitation Center, SSC Arlington Operating Company, L.P., Wilmington Health and Rehabilitation Center, SSC Wilson Operating Company, L.L.C., Murray Forman, Brian Center / Charlotte Retirement Apartments, Jacinto City Healthcare Center, Canyon Sudar Partners, Cambridge North Healthcare Center, Forest Hill Health and Reabilitation Center, Brian Center Health & Rehabilitation / Statesville, Park Highland Nursing & Rehabilitation Center, SSC Crete Operating Company, L.L.C., SSC Clinton Township Operating Company, L.L.C., SSC Fort Collins Spring Creek Operating Company, L.L.C., First Colony Health and Rehabilitation Center, SSC Charlotte Operating Company, L.L.C., Brian Center Health and Rehabilitation / Charlotte, SSC Mooreville Operating Company, L.L.C., SSC Niantic Operating Company, L.L.C., SSC Houston Southwest Operating Company, L.P., SSC San Diego La Paloma Operating Company, L.P., Garden Square at Spring Creek, SSC Houston Northwest Operating Company, L.P., SSC Brush Sunset Manor Operating Company, L.L.C., Lebanon Health and Rehabilitation Center, SSC Houston Woodwind Operating Company, L.L.C., Weatherford Healthcare Center, SSC Asheboro Operating Company, L.L.C., SSC Bastrop Operating Company, L.P., Northwest Health and Rehabilitation Center, SSC Boulder Operating Company, L.L.C., Brian Center Health & Rehabilitation / Durham, SSC Greenfield Operating Company, L.L.C, Bay Villa Health Care Center, SSC Raymondville Operating Company, L.P., SSC Forest Hill Operating Company, L.L.C., Brian Center Health & Rehabilitation / Windsor, Spring Creek Healthcare Center, SSC Gastonia Operating Company, L.L.C., Methuen Health and Rehabilitation Center, Greenview Manor, SSC Denver South Monaco Operating Company, L.L.C., SSC Pasadena Operating Company, L.P., SSC Longmont Operating Company, L.L.C., SSC Weslaco Operating Company, L.P., SSC Greeley Centennial Operating Company, L.L.C., SSC Colorado Springs Aspen Operating Company, L.L.C., SSC Glen Burnie Operating Company, L.L.C., SSC Flint Operating Company, L.L.C., SVCare Holdings, L.L.C., Memorial Medical Nursing Center, SSC San Jose Operating Company, L.P., Westchase Health and Rehabilitation Center, SSC Kerrville Hilltop Village Operating Company, L.P., SavaSeniorCare, LLC, SSC Hendersonville Operating Company, L.L.C., Seventeenth Street Associates, L.L.C., Brian Center Health & Rehabilitation / Goldsboro, SSC Andersonville Operating Company, L.L.C., SSC Missouri City Operating Company, L.P., SSC San Antonio North Operating Company, L.P., SSC Hamilton Operating Company, L.L.C., Odin HealthCare Center, SSC Marlin Operating Company, L.P., SSC Winston-Salem Operating Company, L.L.C., SSC San Antonio Memorial Operating Company, L.P., SSC Weatherford Care Center Operating Company, L.P., Silver Stream Health and Rehabilitation Center, Warren Woods Health and Rehabilitation Center, Edgewater Care Center, Bel Air Health and Rehabilitation Center, Cedar Crest, SSC Westland Operating Company, L.L.C., Huntington Health and Rehabilitation Center, SSC Pueblo Belmont Operating, Company L.L.C., SSC Dallas Operating Company, L.P., Bride Brook Health and Rehabilitation Center, SSC Durham Operating Company, L.L.C., Brian Center Health and Rehabilitation / Hertford, Yuma Life Care Center, SSC Austell Operating Company, L.L.C., SSC Greeley Kenton Operating Company, L.L.C., Retama Manor Nursing Center / Rio Grande City, Peach Tree Place, Southpointe Healthcare Center, Fruitvale HealthCare Center, Brian Center Health & Rehabilitation / Waynesville, Summit Park Health and Rehabilitation Center, Brian Center Health and Rehabilitation / Gastonia, Brian Center Health & Retirement / Mooreville, SSC McAllen Retama Operating Company, L.P., SSC Nashville Operating Company, LLC, SSC Colorado Springs Cedarwood Operating Company, L.L.C., SSC Harlingen Operating Company, L.P., SSC Charlotte Retirement Operating Company, L.L.C., SSC Lexington Operating Company, L.L.C., SE Massachusetts Health and Rehabilitation Center, Kountze Nursing Center, SSC Pueblo Operating Company, L.L.C., North Park Health and Rehabilitation Center, SSC Rio Grande City Operating Company, L.P., SSC Lebanon Operating Company LLC, Retama Manor Nursing Center / Harlingen, SSC Windsor Brian Operating Company, L.L.C., Brian Center Nursing Center / Shamrock, Silver Creek Manor, SSC Brevard Operating Comapny, L.L.C., Mission Carmichael Healthcare Center, SSC Oakland Cambridge Operating Company, L.L.C., Cypresswood Health and Rehabilitation Center, Las Palmas Healthcare Center, Sterling Living Center, SSC Spruce Pine Operating Company, L.L.C., SSC San Antonio Silver Creek Operating Company, L.P., Newport Health and Rehabilitation Center, SSC Germantown Operating Company, L.L.C., SSC Catonsville Operating Company, L.L.C., SSC Yanceyville Operating Company, L.L.C., SSC Silsbee Operating Company, L.P., Clinton-Aire Healthcare Center, SSC Sweeny Operating Company, L.P., SSC Tarzana Operating Company, L.P., Excell Health Care Center, SSC Westchester Operating Company, L.L.C., Terrace Gardens Healthcare Center, Boulder Manor, SSC Bethesda Operating Company, L.L.C., SSC Jourdanton Operating Company, L.P., Alpine Terrace, Brian Center Health & Retirement / Cabarrus, SSC Birmingham Operating Company, L.L.C., SSC Mystic Operating Company, L.L.C., Applewood Living Center, SSC Weatherford Peach Tree Operating Company, L.P., Retama Manor Nursing Center / Laredo-South, Care Inn Of La Grange, Retama Manor Nursing Center / McAllen, SSC Durango Operating Company, L.L.C., Lakeshore Village Healthcare Center, SSC Concord Operating Company, L.L.C., Virginia Highlands Health and Rehabilitation Center, Berhoud Living Center, Retama Manor Nursing Center / San Antonio/ North, SSC Berhoud Operating Company, L.L.C., Brian Center Helath & Rehabilitation / Yanceyville, Windsor Healthcare Center, Levelland Nursing & Rehabilitation Center, SSC LP Holdings, Winchester Lodge Healthcare Center, SSC Statesville Brian Center Operating Company, L.L.C., Fort Collins Health Care Center, Brian Center Health & Rehabilitation / Spruce Pine, Brian Center Health & Rehabilitation / Hendersonville, SSC Pleasanton North Operating Company, L.P., SSC Goldsboro Operating Company, L.L.C., SSC Houston Cypress Wood Operating Company, L.P., SSC Englewood Operating Company, L.L.C., Arcola Health and Rehabilitation Center, SSC Wimberley Operating Company, L.P., Haven Home, Retama Manor Nursing Center / Pleasanton North, SSC Clawson Operating Company, L.L.C., Brian Center Health & Rehabilitation / Wallace, Norris Health and Rehabilitation Center, SSC Forth Worth Downtown Operating Company, L.P., Sunset Manor, SSC Kerrville Alpine Terrace Operating Company, L.P., Faith Memorial Nursing Home, Brian Center Health and Rehabilitation / Salisbury, SSC Loveland Operating Company, L.L.C., SSC Methuen Operating Company, L.L.C., Retama Manor Nursing Center / Pleasanton South, SSC Goldthwaite Operating Comapny, L.P., SSC Fenton Operating Company, L.L.C., SSC Silver Stream Operating Company, L.L.C., Courtyard Care Center, Arlington Heights Health and Rehabilitation Center, SSC Oakland Fruitvale Operating Company, L.P., SSC Baltimore Operating Company, L.L.C., SSC Harris Jacinto City, L.P., SSC Mount Vernon Operating Company, L.L.C., SSC Pittsburg Operating Company, L.P., Brian Center Health & Rehabilitation / Hickory East, Brian Center Health and Retirement / Lincolnton, SSC Bangs Operating Company, L.P., The Westbury Place, Monaco Parkway Health and Rehabilitation Center, Brian Center Health and Rehabilitation / Eden, Retama Manor Nursing Center / Laredo - West, SSC Charlotte Shamrock Operating Company, L.L.C., SSC Yuma Operating Company, L.L.C., SSC Bay City Operating Company, L.P., SSC Lincolnton Operating Company, L.L.C., Palisades Living Center, SSC New Bedford Operating Company, LLC, SSC Nueces Retama, L.P., Crestmont Nursing Care Center, SSC Waco Greenview Operating Company, L.P., Heritage Manor Healthcare Center, Retama Manor Nursing Center / Weslaco, SSC Lagrange Operating Company, L.P., SSC Kerrville Edgewater Operating Company, L.P., Westchester Health and Rehabilitation Center, Randolph Health and Rehabilitation Center, SSC Kenesaw Operating Company, L.L.C., Sumter East Health and Rehabilitation Center, Crete Manor, SSC Laredo South Operating Company, L.P., SSC Harris Spring Branch, L.P., Golden Years Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, Montebello HealthCare Center, Downtown Health and Rehabilitation Center, SSC Warren Operating Company, L.L.C., Brian Center Health & Retirement / Monroe, Brian Center Health & Rehabilitation / Canton, Countrybrook Living Center, Brian Center Health & Rehabilitation / Brevard, Grande Prairie Health and Rehabilitation Center, Greenhills Health and Rehabilitation Center, Spring Branch Healthcare Center, SSC Levelland Operating Company, L.P., SSC Pleasant Prairie Operating Company, L.L.C., Cambridge South Healthcare Center, Maple Leaf Health Care, Brian Center Nursing Care / Lexington and SSC Athens Operating Company, L.P.
Case Number: 3:2015cv01102
Filed: October 15, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Office: Nashville Office
County: Davidson
Presiding Judge: William L Campbell
Referring Judge: Alistair Newbern
Nature of Suit: Qui Tam (31 U.S.C. § 3729(a))
Cause of Action: 31 U.S.C. ยง 3729
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 21, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2020 Case stayed until 12/29/20 per DE #449 in lead case. (vh)
February 25, 2020 Case stayed until 4/21/20 per DE #425 in lead case. (vh)
March 1, 2019 Case Stayed per 375 order entered in Lead Case, 3:11-cv-00821. (jm)
June 6, 2018 Filing 72 Certificate of Service and Certificate of Good Standing re #71 MOTION for attorney(s) David Berg to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Fee not paid-due within 21 days) by Tramell Kukoyi. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Hamilton, William) Modified Text on 6/7/2018 (am).
June 6, 2018 TX State Bar status verified as active for David Berg. (am)
June 5, 2018 Filing 71 MOTION for attorney(s) David Berg to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Fee not paid-due within 21 days) by Tramell Kukoyi. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Hamilton, William) Modified on 7/19/2018 (am).
February 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER: Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 138, entered on January 18, 2018, regarding the reassignment of cases to Judge William L. Campbell, Jr., this case is hereby transferred to Judge Campbell. All previously imposed deadlines and Court dates remain unchanged pending further order from Judge Campbell. Signed by Judge Curtis Collier on 2/28/18. (afs)
February 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER: Pursuant to the designation by the Sixth Circuit Court of Appeals that United States District Judge for the Eastern District of Tennessee Judge Curtis L. Collier may perform services in this district, it is hereby ORDERED that this case is TRANSFERRED to Judge Collier for all purposes, including trial. Signed by Chief Judge Kevin H. Sharp on 2/10/17. (dt)
September 13, 2016 Due to the retirement of Magistrate Judge Bryant effective 8/31/2016 and pursuant to Administrative Order No. 138 entered on 9/1/2016, the magistrate judge now assigned to this case is Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (gb)
November 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER granting #65 Motion for Sarah M. Frazier to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge John S. Bryant on 11/19/15. (afs) Modified on 11/19/2015 (afs).
November 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER granting #64 Motion for Joe M. Androphy to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge John S. Bryant on 11/19/15. (afs) Modified on 11/19/2015 (afs).
November 18, 2015 Filing 66 RECEIPT #34675038866 in the amount of $150 re #64 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #65 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (afs)
November 12, 2015 BAR STATUS for Attorneys, Sarah M. Frazier and Joel M. Androphy of TX, verified as active on this date. (afs)
November 11, 2015 Filing 65 MOTION for attorney(s) Sarah M. Frazier to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Fee not paid-due within 20 days) by Tramell Kukoyi. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Hamilton, William)
November 11, 2015 Filing 64 MOTION for attorney(s) Joel M. Androphy to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Fee not paid-due within 20 days) by Tramell Kukoyi. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Hamilton, William)
October 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 63 SEALED ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Kevin H. Sharp on 10/21/15. (Copy emailed to counsel of record) (afs) Modified on 10/21/2015 (afs).
October 21, 2015 Per Order of Consolidation entered in 3:11-0821 (DE#58), all future filings shall be made in the Lead Case 3:11-0821. (eh)
October 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER REFERRING CASE: This case is hereby referred to the Magistrate Judge for case management purposes pursuantto Local Rule 16.01.IT IS SO ORDERED. Case Referred to Magistrate John S. Bryant. (Copy emailed to counsel of record) Signed by Chief Judge Kevin H. Sharp on 10/20/15. (afs) Modified on 10/21/2015 (afs).
October 19, 2015 Filing 61 NOTICE OF ELECTION TO INTERVENE IN PART AND TO DECLINE TO INTERVENE IN PART, by United States of America (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Order)(afs)
October 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER: Upon consideration of the United States' Motion for Reassignment Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 176, and for good cause shown: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerks Office reassign this case to Chief Judge Sharp pursuant to Administrative Order No. 176. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 10/19/15. (afs) Modified on 10/19/2015 (afs). (Emailed to Counsel of record)
October 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER granting #57 Motion to Reassign Case. Case reassigned to Chief Judge Kevin H. Sharp for all further proceedings. District Judge Aleta A. Trauger no longer assigned to the case. (Copy emailed to counsel of record) Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 10/19/15. (afs)
October 16, 2015 Filing 58 MEMORANDUM in Support of #57 MOTION to Reassign Case filed by United States of America. (afs)
October 16, 2015 Filing 57 MOTION FOR REASSIGNMENT, by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Order)(afs)
October 15, 2015 Filing 56 SEALED civil case transferred in from the Southern District of Texas, Case Number 4:11-cv-04216. New case number in the MDTN is 3:15-cv-1102.
October 14, 2015 Filing 55 Document(s) Sent to Middle District of Tennessee, Nashville, Division by FedEx #807582520337 re: Entire Case, filed. (mewilliams, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/15/2015.]
October 14, 2015 Filing 54 Interdistrict transfer to USDC-Middle District of Tennessee, Nashville Division. Copies of documents numbered 1-53 sent, Certified copy of transfer order, certified docket sheet, and two copies of transfer letter (with a return envelope) sent. Case terminated on 10/07/15, filed. (mewilliams, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/15/2015.]
October 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER granting #43 Motion to Transfer Case to USDC-Middle District of Tennessee, Nashville Division. (Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified mail. (mewilliams, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/15/2015.]
October 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER granting #49 Motion for Extension of Time. The United States and other named governmental entities shall have up to and including 10/21/2015 within which to notify the Court of its decision to intervene in this action. It is further Ordered that this action, the complaint, first amended complaint and all other filings in this case remain under seal except as previously ordered by this Court.(Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(rhawkins) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/15/2015.]
September 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER granting #48 Unopposed Ex Parte Application to Partially Lift Seal. (Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Party notified by mail. (mewilliams, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/15/2015.]
September 18, 2015 Filing 50 MEMORANDUM In Support re: #49 Unopposed Ex Parte Application by United States of America, filed. (mewilliams, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/15/2015.]
September 18, 2015 Filing 49 Unopposed Ex Parte Application for an Extension of (1) Time to Consider Election to Intervene and (2) The Seal by United States of America, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/9/2015. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (mewilliams, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/15/2015.]
September 16, 2015 Filing 48 Unopposed Ex Parte Application to Partially Lift Seal by Tramell Kukoyi, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/7/2015. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (mewilliams, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/15/2015.]
September 16, 2015 Filing 47 Sealed Order, filed. [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/15/2015.]
September 16, 2015 Filing 46 NOTICE of Nonopposition re: #43 Motion to Transfer Venue of Sealed Case by Tramell Kukoyi, filed. (mewilliams, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/15/2015.]
August 31, 2015 Filing 45 Unopposed Out of Time Motion for Leave to Extend The Deadline to Respond by Tramell Kukoyi, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/21/2015. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (mewilliams, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/15/2015.]
August 3, 2015 Filing 44 MEMORANDUM In Support re: #43 Ex Parte Opposed Motion to Transfer Venue of Sealed Case by United States of America, filed. (mewilliams, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/15/2015.]
August 3, 2015 Filing 43 Ex Parte Opposed Motion to Transfer Venue of Sealed Case by United States of America, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/24/2015. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (mewilliams, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/15/2015.]
August 3, 2015 Filing 42 MEMORANDUM In Support re: #41 Unopposed Ex Parte Application by United States of America, filed. (mewilliams, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/15/2015.]
August 3, 2015 Filing 41 Unopposed Ex Parte Application for an Extension of (1) Time to Consider Election to Intervene and (2) The Seal by United States of America, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/24/2015. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (mewilliams, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/15/2015.]
July 30, 2015 Filing 40 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Tramell Kukoyi. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by Tramell Kukoyi. (Attachments: #1 Continuation, #2 Continuation, #3 Continuation)(emathis, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/15/2015.]
May 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting #37 Motion for Extension of Time to Intervene. The United States has up to and including 8/4/2015 within which to notify the Court of its decision to intervene in this action; the United States may disclose and provide a copy of the complaint, any amended complaints, related pleadings or subset of information to a mediator and the mediator's staff; the complaint and all other filings in this case remain under seal as previously ordered.(Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(rhawkins) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/15/2015.]
April 28, 2015 Filing 38 MEMORANDUM In Support re: #37 Unopposed Ex Parte Application by United States of America, filed. (mewilliams, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/15/2015.]
April 28, 2015 Filing 37 Unopposed Ex Parte Application for an Extension of (1) Time to Consider Election to Intervene and (2) The Seal by United States of America, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/19/2015. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (mewilliams, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/15/2015.]
March 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting #34 Unopposed Ex Parte Application. The United States shall have up to and including 5/4/2015, within which to notify the Court of its decision to intervene in this action. (Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Party notified by mail. (mewilliams, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/15/2015.]
January 30, 2015 Filing 35 MEMORANDUM In Support re: #34 Unopposed Ex Parte Application for an Extension by United States of America, filed. (mewilliams, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/15/2015.]
January 30, 2015 Filing 34 Unopposed Ex Parte Application for an Extension of (1) Time to Consider Election to Intervene and (2) The Seal by United States of America, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/20/2015. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (mewilliams, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/15/2015.]
November 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting #31 Unopposed Ex Parte Application. The United States and other named governmental entities shall have up to and including 02/03/15, within which to notify the Court of its decision to intervene in this action. (Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified by mail. (mewilliams, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/15/2015.]
October 28, 2014 Filing 32 MEMORANDUM in Support re: #31 Unopposed Ex Parte Application by United States of America, filed. (mewilliams, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/15/2015.]
October 28, 2014 Filing 31 Unopposed Ex Parte Application for an Extension of (1) Time to Consider Election to Intervene and (2) The Seal by United States of America, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/18/2014. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (mewilliams, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/15/2015.]
September 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting #28 Unopposed Ex Parte Application to Partially Lift Seal. (Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified by mail. (mewilliams, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/15/2015.]
September 10, 2014 Filing 29 MEMORANDUM In Support re: #28 Unopposed Ex Parte Application by United States of America, filed. (mewilliams, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/15/2015.]
September 10, 2014 Filing 28 Unopposed Ex Parte Application to Partially Lift Seal by United States of America, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/1/2014. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (mewilliams, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/15/2015.]
July 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #25 Motion for Extension of Time.(Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(rvazquez) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/15/2015.]
July 28, 2014 Filing 26 MEMORANDUM In Support re: #25 Unopposed Ex Parte Application by United States of America, filed. (mewilliams, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/15/2015.]
July 28, 2014 Filing 25 Unopposed Ex Parte Application for an Extension of (1) Time to Consider Election to Intervene and (2) The Seal by United States of America, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/18/2014. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (mewilliams, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/15/2015.]
January 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #22 Unopposed Ex Parte Application; United States shall have up to and including 8/4/2014, within which to notify the Court of its decision to intervene. (Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified by mail. (mewilliams, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/15/2015.]
January 30, 2014 Filing 23 MEMORANDUM In Support re: #22 Unopposed Ex Parte Application by United States of America, filed. (mewilliams, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/15/2015.]
January 30, 2014 Filing 22 Unopposed Ex Parte Application For An Extension Of (1) Time To Consider Election To Intervene And (2) The Seal by United States of America, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/20/2014. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (mewilliams, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/15/2015.]
August 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #19 Motion for Extension of Time.(Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(rvazquez) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/15/2015.]
July 31, 2013 Filing 20 MEMORANDUM In Support re: #19 Unopposed Ex Parte Application by United States of America, filed. (mewilliams, ) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/15/2015.]
July 31, 2013 Filing 19 Unopposed Ex Parte Application For An Extension Of (1) Time To Consider Election To Intervene And (2) The Seal by United States of America, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/21/2013. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (mewilliams, ) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/15/2015.]
May 28, 2013 Filing 18 NOTICE of Breach of Seal by United States of America, filed. (mewilliams, ) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/15/2015.]
January 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #15 Unopposed Ex Parte Application; United States shall have up to and including 8/5/2013, within which to notify the Court of its decision to intervene in this action. (Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) USA notified by mail. (mewilliams, ) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/15/2015.]
January 23, 2013 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM In Support re: #15 Unopposed Ex Parte Application by United States of America, filed. (mewilliams, ) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/15/2015.]
January 23, 2013 Filing 15 Unopposed Ex Parte Application For An Extension Of (1) Time To Consider Election To Intervene And (2) The Seal by United States of America, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/13/2013. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (mewilliams, ) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/15/2015.]
July 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time.The United States shall have up to and including 02/04/13 to notify the Court of its decision to intervene. (Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(htippen, ) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/15/2015.]
July 24, 2012 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM In Support re: #12 Unopposed Ex Parte Application by United States of America, filed. (mewilliams, ) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/15/2015.]
July 24, 2012 Filing 12 Unopposed Ex Parte Application For An Extension Of (1) Time To Consider Election To Intervene And (2) The Seal by United States of America, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/14/2012. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (mewilliams, ) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/15/2015.]
May 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion to Partially Lifting Seal. Seal partilly lifted so that US may disclose the allegations raised in this action. The complaint, and all other filings shall remain under seal..(Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified by mail. (mewilliams, ) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/15/2015.]
April 17, 2012 Filing 10 Ex Parte Application To Partially Lift Seal by United States of America, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/8/2012. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Memorandum in Support) (mewilliams, ) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/15/2015.]
March 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Application to Partially Lift Seal. Case to remain under seal. (Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Party notified by mail. (mewilliams, ) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/15/2015.]
March 12, 2012 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM In support re: #7 Application to Partially Lift Seal by United States of America, filed. (mewilliams, ) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/15/2015.]
March 12, 2012 Filing 7 Application to Partially Lift Seal by United States of America, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/2/2012. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (mewilliams, ) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/15/2015.]
March 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order granting #4 United States' Unopposed Ex Parte Application For An Extension of (1) Time to Consider Election To Intervene and (2) The Seal. The United States has up to 08/06/12 to notify the Court of its decision to intervene in this action. It is further ordered that the complaint, first amended complaint, and all other filings in this case remain under seal except as previously ordered by this Court., filed. [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/15/2015.]
February 7, 2012 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM In Support re: #4 Unopposed Ex Parte Application by United States of America, filed. (mewilliams, ) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/15/2015.]
February 7, 2012 Filing 4 Unopposed Ex Parte Application For An Extension Of (1) Time To Consider Election To Intervene And (2) The Seal by United States of America, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/28/2012. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (mewilliams, ) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/15/2015.]
December 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion to Seal. (Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified by mail. (mewilliams, ) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/15/2015.]
December 6, 2011 Filing 2 MOTION to Seal by Tramell Kukoyi, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/27/2011. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (mewilliams, ) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/15/2015.]
December 6, 2011 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against SavaSeniorCare, L.L.C., et al., (Filing fee $ 350) filed by Tramell Kukoyi. (mewilliams, ) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/15/2015.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kukoyi ex rel., et al. v. SavaSeniorCare, LLC., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cedarwood Health Care Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SSC Waynesville Operating Company, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Minnequa Medicenter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fairview Health and Rehabilitation Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bethesda Health and Rehabilitation Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SSC Kenansville Operating Company, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pearl Street Health and Rehabilitation Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brazosview Healthcare Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Overlea Health and Rehabilitation Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SSC Windsor Operating Company, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SSC Laredo West Operating Company, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aspen Living Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SSC Richmond Operating Company, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Four Corners Health Care Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glen Burnie Health and Rehabilitation Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SSC Houston Woodwind Operating GP, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SSC SubMaster Holdings, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alpine Living Center, SSC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SSC Kountze Operating Company, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SavaSeniorCare Administrative Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patuxent River Health and Rehabilitation Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bastrop Nursing Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SSC Hertford Operating Company, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pine Arbor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North Arundel Health and Rehabilitation Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Meadows Health and Rehabilitation Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Center Health & Retirement / Winston Salem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SSC Colorado Springs Colonial Columns Operating Company, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SSC Hickory 13th Operating Company, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Centennial Healthcare Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hillview Manor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SSC Statesville Maple Leaf Operating Company, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colonial Columns Nursing Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Interlochen Health and Rehabilitation Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SSC Weaverville Operating Company, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SSC Fort Collins Lemay Avenue Operating Company, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ashland Health and Rehabilitation Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SSC Pampa Operating Company, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heritage Harbour Health and Rehabilitation Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SSC Waco Lakeshore Village Operating Company, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SSC Alvin Operating Company, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SSC Atlanta Operating Company, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenton Manor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenansville Health and Rehabilitation Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SSC Alice Operating Company, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SSC Equity Holdings, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SSC Montrose San Juan Operating Company, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sweeny House
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deer Creek of Wimberley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SSC Palisade Operating Company, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SSC Hickory East Operating Company, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anderson Mill Health and Rehabilitation Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SSC Odin Operating Company, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SSC Pasadena Vista Operating Company, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SSC Pleasanton South Operating Company, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Juan Living Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Retama Manor Nursing Center / Alice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SSC San Antonio Northgate Operating Comapny, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SSC Harris Village, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nature Trail Health Care Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hope Healthcare Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SSC Brookhaven Operating Company, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SSC Newport Beach Operating Company, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SSC Sterling Operating Company, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diamond Ridge HealthCare Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northgate Health and Rehabilitation Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SSC Ashland Operating Company, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SSC Wallace Operating Company, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Retama Manor Nursing Center / Corpus Christi North
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thorton Operating Company L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Retama Manor Nursing Center / Jourdanton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cambridge East Healthcare Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SSC Denver Red Rocks Operating Company, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SSC Laurel Operating Company, L.L.C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: La Paloma Nursing Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SSC Carmichael Operating Company, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SSC GlenBurnie North Arundel Operating Company, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SSC Montgomery Cedar Crest Operating Company, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SSC Beverly Hills Operating Company, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SSC Eden Operating Company, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SSC McAllen Las Palmas Operating Company, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SSC Sumter East Operating Company, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SSC Salisbury Operating Company, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pampa Nursing Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Belmont Lodge Health Care Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Memorial City Health and Rehabilitation Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Retama Manor Nursing Center / Edinburgh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SSC Canton Operating Company, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SSC Wilmington Operating Company, L.L.C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SSC Superior Township Operating Company, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SSC McKinney Operating Company, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leonard Grunstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flagship Healthcare Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Center Health & Rehabilitation / Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SSC Monroe Operating Company, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SSC Colorado Springs Terrace Gardens Operating Company, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Center Health and Rehabilitation Hickory Viewmont
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SSC Newport Operating Company, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northeast Atlanta Health and Rehabilitation Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Woodwind Lakes Health & Rehabilitation Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tarzana Health and Rehabilitation Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Retama Manor Nursing Center Raymondville
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SSC Oakland Excell Operating Company, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SSC Annapolis Operating Company, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SSC Bel Air Operating Company, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Center Health & Rehabilitation / Weaverville
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SSC Edinburgh Operating Company, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Superior Woods Healthcare Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pasadena Care Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hilltop Village Nursing and Rehabilitation Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bangs Nursing Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jewell Care Center of Denver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SSC Houston Westbury Place Operating Company, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sierra Vista Health Care Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SSC Fort Worth Nursing & Rehabilitation Center Operating Company, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pendleton Health and Rehabilitation Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SSC Arlington Operating Company, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wilmington Health and Rehabilitation Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SSC Wilson Operating Company, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Murray Forman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Center / Charlotte Retirement Apartments
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacinto City Healthcare Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Canyon Sudar Partners
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cambridge North Healthcare Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Forest Hill Health and Reabilitation Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Center Health & Rehabilitation / Statesville
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Park Highland Nursing & Rehabilitation Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SSC Crete Operating Company, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SSC Clinton Township Operating Company, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SSC Fort Collins Spring Creek Operating Company, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Colony Health and Rehabilitation Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SSC Charlotte Operating Company, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Center Health and Rehabilitation / Charlotte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SSC Mooreville Operating Company, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SSC Niantic Operating Company, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SSC Houston Southwest Operating Company, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SSC San Diego La Paloma Operating Company, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Garden Square at Spring Creek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SSC Houston Northwest Operating Company, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SSC Brush Sunset Manor Operating Company, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lebanon Health and Rehabilitation Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SSC Houston Woodwind Operating Company, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weatherford Healthcare Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SSC Asheboro Operating Company, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SSC Bastrop Operating Company, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northwest Health and Rehabilitation Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SSC Boulder Operating Company, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Center Health & Rehabilitation / Durham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SSC Greenfield Operating Company, L.L.C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bay Villa Health Care Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SSC Raymondville Operating Company, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SSC Forest Hill Operating Company, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Center Health & Rehabilitation / Windsor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spring Creek Healthcare Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SSC Gastonia Operating Company, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Methuen Health and Rehabilitation Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greenview Manor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SSC Denver South Monaco Operating Company, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SSC Pasadena Operating Company, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SSC Longmont Operating Company, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SSC Weslaco Operating Company, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SSC Greeley Centennial Operating Company, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SSC Colorado Springs Aspen Operating Company, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SSC Glen Burnie Operating Company, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SSC Flint Operating Company, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SVCare Holdings, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Memorial Medical Nursing Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SSC San Jose Operating Company, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westchase Health and Rehabilitation Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SSC Kerrville Hilltop Village Operating Company, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SavaSeniorCare, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SSC Hendersonville Operating Company, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seventeenth Street Associates, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Center Health & Rehabilitation / Goldsboro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SSC Andersonville Operating Company, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SSC Missouri City Operating Company, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SSC San Antonio North Operating Company, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SSC Hamilton Operating Company, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Odin HealthCare Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SSC Marlin Operating Company, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SSC Winston-Salem Operating Company, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SSC San Antonio Memorial Operating Company, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SSC Weatherford Care Center Operating Company, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Silver Stream Health and Rehabilitation Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren Woods Health and Rehabilitation Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edgewater Care Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bel Air Health and Rehabilitation Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cedar Crest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SSC Westland Operating Company, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Huntington Health and Rehabilitation Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SSC Pueblo Belmont Operating, Company L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SSC Dallas Operating Company, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bride Brook Health and Rehabilitation Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SSC Durham Operating Company, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Center Health and Rehabilitation / Hertford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yuma Life Care Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SSC Austell Operating Company, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SSC Greeley Kenton Operating Company, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Retama Manor Nursing Center / Rio Grande City
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peach Tree Place
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southpointe Healthcare Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fruitvale HealthCare Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Center Health & Rehabilitation / Waynesville
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Summit Park Health and Rehabilitation Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Center Health and Rehabilitation / Gastonia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Center Health & Retirement / Mooreville
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SSC McAllen Retama Operating Company, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SSC Nashville Operating Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SSC Colorado Springs Cedarwood Operating Company, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SSC Harlingen Operating Company, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SSC Charlotte Retirement Operating Company, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SSC Lexington Operating Company, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SE Massachusetts Health and Rehabilitation Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kountze Nursing Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SSC Pueblo Operating Company, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North Park Health and Rehabilitation Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SSC Rio Grande City Operating Company, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SSC Lebanon Operating Company LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Retama Manor Nursing Center / Harlingen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SSC Windsor Brian Operating Company, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Center Nursing Center / Shamrock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Silver Creek Manor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SSC Brevard Operating Comapny, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mission Carmichael Healthcare Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SSC Oakland Cambridge Operating Company, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cypresswood Health and Rehabilitation Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Las Palmas Healthcare Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sterling Living Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SSC Spruce Pine Operating Company, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SSC San Antonio Silver Creek Operating Company, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Newport Health and Rehabilitation Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SSC Germantown Operating Company, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SSC Catonsville Operating Company, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SSC Yanceyville Operating Company, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SSC Silsbee Operating Company, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clinton-Aire Healthcare Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SSC Sweeny Operating Company, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SSC Tarzana Operating Company, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Excell Health Care Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SSC Westchester Operating Company, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terrace Gardens Healthcare Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boulder Manor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SSC Bethesda Operating Company, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SSC Jourdanton Operating Company, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alpine Terrace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Center Health & Retirement / Cabarrus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SSC Birmingham Operating Company, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SSC Mystic Operating Company, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Applewood Living Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SSC Weatherford Peach Tree Operating Company, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Retama Manor Nursing Center / Laredo-South
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Care Inn Of La Grange
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Retama Manor Nursing Center / McAllen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SSC Durango Operating Company, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lakeshore Village Healthcare Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SSC Concord Operating Company, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Virginia Highlands Health and Rehabilitation Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Berhoud Living Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Retama Manor Nursing Center / San Antonio/ North
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SSC Berhoud Operating Company, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance |