Doe v. Andrews et al
Plaintiff: Jane Doe
Defendant: Joseph McGregor Andrews, The Pi Kappa Alpha International Fraternity, Inc., The Delta Epsilon Chapter of Pi Kappa Alpha International Fraternity, Inc. and Delta Epsilon House Corporation
Case Number: 3:2015cv01127
Filed: October 27, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Office: Nashville Office
County: Davidson
Presiding Judge: Aleta A. Trauger
Nature of Suit: Assault, Libel, and Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 245 MEMORANDUM OPINION OF THE COURT. Signed by Judge Curtis Collier on 8/9/2017. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(jw)
August 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 242 MEMORANDUM OPINION OF THE COURT. Signed by Judge Curtis Collier on 8/3/2017. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(jw)
February 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 62 MEMORANDUM OPINION OF THE COURT. Signed by District Judge Todd J. Campbell on 2/17/2016. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(jw)
January 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 51 MEMORANDUM OPINION OF THE COURT. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 1/5/2016. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(jw)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe v. Andrews et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe
Represented By: Charles W. Gameros, Jr.
Represented By: Tricia Herzfeld
Represented By: Michael G. Sawicki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph McGregor Andrews
Represented By: Charles Leland Davis
Represented By: David W. Garrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Pi Kappa Alpha International Fraternity, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas J. Dement, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Delta Epsilon Chapter of Pi Kappa Alpha International Fraternity, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas J. Dement, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Epsilon House Corporation
Represented By: Thomas J. Dement, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?