Burgos et al v. JBS Carriers, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Juan Burgos and Kristi Cole
Defendant: JBS Carriers, Inc., Doe Defendants A, B, C, D, E, and F and Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2015cv01415
Filed: December 1, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Office: Nashville Office
County: Davidson
Presiding Judge: Todd J. Campbell
Presiding Judge: Barbara D. Holmes
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER AND STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL: Any and all claims against Doe Defendants D, E, and F, which were or could have been raised in this action, including the claims embodied in the Complaint and Amended Complaint, be, and the same hereby are, dismissed with prejudice. It is further ORDERED that there shall not be an award of attorneys' fees, expenses, or costs to any party. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 11/6/17. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
September 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER: The Report and Recommendation 22 is adopted and approved. Accordingly, Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Amend 16 is GRANTED as to the addition of Gary MacDonnell as a Defendant and DENIED as to the addition of Paccar Financial Corp. and Wells Fargo Equipment Finance, Inc. as Defendants. Signed by District Judge Todd J. Campbell on 9/21/16. (dt)
September 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 22 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 16 MOTION for Leave to Amend Complaint. Based on the foregoing, the Magistrate Judge respectfully recommends that Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint be GRANTED as to the addition of Gary MacDonnell as a Defendant and DENIED as to the addition of Paccar and Wells Fargo as Defendants. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 9/2/2016. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(hb)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burgos et al v. JBS Carriers, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Burgos
Represented By: William B. Hicky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristi Cole
Represented By: William B. Hicky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JBS Carriers, Inc.
Represented By: Charles Joseph Hubbard
Represented By: Frank Wilbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Defendants A, B, C, D, E, and F
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Gary R. Wilkinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?