Jones v. Ameriquest Mortgage et al
Plaintiff: |
Yvonne C. Jones |
Defendant: |
Ameriquest Mortgage, American Home Mortgage/Homeward Residential, Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, Deutsche Bank National Trust Company and Jason Mangrum |
Case Number: |
3:2016cv00361 |
Filed: |
February 22, 2016 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee |
Office: |
Nashville Office |
County: |
Davidson |
Presiding Judge: |
Todd J. Campbell |
Presiding Judge: |
Barbara D. Holmes |
Nature of Suit: |
Foreclosure |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1441 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
June 21, 2016 |
Filing
21
ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS: The Report and Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge is adopted and approved. The Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendants Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC; Homeward Residential, Inc. (formerly known as American Ho me Mortgage Services, Inc.), and Deutsche Bank National Trust Company (Docket No. 8 ) is GRANTED. Plaintiff's claims against all Defendants are DISMISSED. The Clerk is directed to close the file. This Order shall constitute the final judgment in this case pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 58. Signed by District Judge Todd J. Campbell on 6/21/2016. (xc:Pro se party by regular and certified mail.)(DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(eh)
|
May 17, 2016 |
Filing
15
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: The Court respectfully RECOMMENDS that: 1) the motion to dismiss (Docket Entry No. 8) filed by Defendants Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, Homeward Residential, Inc. (formerly known as American Home Mortgage Services, Inc.), a nd Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Trustee for Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Trustee for Ameriquest Mortgage Securities Inc., Asset-Backed Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2005-R4 be GRANTED; 2) the claims against Defendants Ame riquest Mortgage and Jason Mangrum be DISMISSED for the reasons stated herein; and 3) this action be DISMISSED in its entirety. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 5/17/2016. (xc:Pro se party by regular and certified mail.)(DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(eh)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?