Thomas et al v. Haslam et al Featured Case

A case disputing the constitutionality of the revocation of a drivers license for failure to pay court fines and other fees associated with an arrest or imprisonment for more than a year

Plaintiff: James Thomas and David Hixson
Defendant: Bill Haslam, David W. Purkey and Herbert Slatery, III
Case Number: 3:2017cv00005
Filed: January 4, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Office: Nashville Office
County: Davidson
Presiding Judge: Aleta A. Trauger
Nature of Suit: Constitutionality of State Statutes
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 11, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2018 Filing 115 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Application for Attorneys' Fees by David Hixson, James Thomas. (White, Matthew)
July 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER: For the reasons explained in the accompanying Memorandum, the Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Tennessee Department of Safety and Homeland Security ("TDSHS") Commissioner David W. Purkey ("Commissioner") (Docket No. 61 ) is hereby DENIED and the Motion for Summary Judgment filed by James Thomas and David Hixson (Docket No. 37 ) is GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 7/2/18. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
July 2, 2018 Filing 113 MEMORANDUM Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 7/2/18. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
June 25, 2018 TN State Bar status verified as active for Sara Ohlman. (dt)
June 22, 2018 Filing 112 NOTICE of Appearance by Sara Ohlman on behalf of All Defendants (Ohlman, Sara)
May 15, 2018 Filing 111 REPLY filed by David Hixson, James Thomas re 110 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by David W. Purkey. (White, Matthew)
May 8, 2018 Filing 110 RESPONSE to 107 Supplemental Brief filed by David W. Purkey. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A -- email dated 3/28/18, # 2 Attachment 1 -- Adams v. United States, # 3 Attachment 2 -- Mata-Cuellar v. Tennessee Dept. of Safety)(Campbell, Andrew) Modified on 5/9/2018 (dt).
April 27, 2018 Filing 109 CONFORMED CERTIFICATE of Service filed by David Hixson, James Thomas re 107 Supplemental Brief filed by David Hixson, James Thomas. (White, Matthew) Modified on 5/1/2018 (dt).
April 27, 2018 Notice to Filer re DE 107 : Pursuant to Local Rule 5.01, all filings shall include a Certificate of Service and it shall identify by name the person served, what was served, the method of service, and date of service. Counsel SHALL FILE a conformed Certificate of Service for this document using the Certificate event located under Other Documents.(dt)
April 25, 2018 Filing 108 NOTICE of Filing by David Hixson, James Thomas re 107 Brief (non-appeal) Declaration of Adie Tomer and Exhibits Thereto (Attachments: # 1 Attachment Declaration of Adie Tomer, # 2 Exhibit 1 - Tomer CV, # 3 Exhibit 2 - Brookings Report)(White, Matthew)
April 25, 2018 Filing 107 SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF filed by David Hixson, James Thomas re 97 Status Report, 94 Order. (White, Matthew) Modified on 4/27/2018 (dt).
April 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER: The Request for Clarification filed by the plaintiffs (Docket No 105 ) is hereby GRANTED. The court hereby appoints as class counsel the individuals and organizations/lawfirm listed in the Designation of Those Seeking Appointment as Class Counsel filed on April 6, 2018 (Docket No. 96 ). It is further ORDERED that the court appoints as lead counsel, to serve as point of contact for the court and opposing counsel, Jonathan Cole and Matthew White of the Baker Donelson firm. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 4/19/18. (dt) (Main Document 106 replaced on 4/19/2018) (dt).
April 19, 2018 Filing 105 MOTION to Clarify re 100 Order, by David Hixson, James Thomas. (White, Matthew)
April 17, 2018 Filing 104 Letter dated 4/10/2018 from David Tulis. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment - supporting documents)(dt)
April 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER: The court is in receipt of a letter from David Tulis dated April 10, 2018 with accompanying documents. It is hereby ORDERED that the Clerk shall file this letter and the accompanying documents as part of the record in this case. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 4/16/18. (dt)
April 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER granting 101 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Katherine Dix terminated. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 4/12/18. (dt)
April 12, 2018 Filing 101 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by David W. Purkey. (Dix, Katherine)
April 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER: Within 10 days of the entry of this Order, the plaintiffs shall designate two lawyers who shall function as lead counsel for the class in this case. The court has a strong preference that one of the lawyers be with the law firm involved in this litigation on behalf of the plaintiffs. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 4/12/18. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
April 10, 2018 Filing 99 Letter from Arthur Hirsch re: Travel v. Transporation. (dt)
April 10, 2018 TN State Bar status verified as active for Jonathan Jacob Cole. (dt)
April 9, 2018 Filing 98 NOTICE by David W. Purkey of Filing Supplemental Statment (Campbell, Andrew)
April 9, 2018 Filing 97 JOINT TATUS REPORT and Submission in Response to Order of March 26, 2018 (ECF # 94 ) by David Hixson and James Thomas. (White, Matthew) Modified on 4/10/2018 (dt).
April 6, 2018 Filing 96 NOTICE by David Hixson, James Thomas of Filing Designation of Those Seeking Appointment as Class Counsel (White, Matthew)
April 6, 2018 Filing 95 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Jacob Cole on behalf of David Hixson, James Thomas (Cole, Jonathan)
March 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER: For the reasons explained in the accompanying Memorandum, Commissioner David W. Purkey's Motion to Dismiss (Docket No. 23 ) is hereby DENIED. The Renewed Motion for Class Certification filed by James Thomas and David Hixson (Docket No. 36 ) is GRANTED. Counsel for the plaintiffs are ORDERED to designate in writing which individual or individuals seek appointment as class counsel, in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 23(g), by close of business on April 6, 2018. The parties' respective Motions for Summary Judgment (Docket Nos. 37 & 61) are HELD IN ABEYANCE pending the completion of the supplemental stipulations and briefing ordered below. The parties are ORDERED to file supplemental stipulations and briefing. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 3/26/18. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
March 26, 2018 Filing 93 MEMORANDUM Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 3/26/18. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
February 2, 2018 NY State Bar status verified as active for Theresa Lau. (dt)
February 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER granting 91 Motion for Theresa Lau to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 2/2/18. (dt)
February 2, 2018 Filing 91 MOTION for attorney(s) Theresa Lau to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-2604067) by David Hixson, James Thomas. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing from SDNY)(White, Matthew)
January 19, 2018 Filing 90 NOTICE of Filing by David W. Purkey Unreported Authorities (Attachments: # 1 Attachment 1 -- Rules of Tenn. Dept of Safety Driver Control Division, Ch. 1340-1-8, Rules of Procedure for Hearing Contested Cases, # 2 Attachment 2 -- Bowman v. Skyview Apartments, # 3 Attachment 3 -- Davis v. Wells Fargo, NA, # 4 Attachment 4 -- Duncan v. Cone, # 5 Attachment 5 -- Evans v. Rhodes (R&R), # 6 Attachment 6 -- Evans v. Rhodes (Order adopting R&R), # 7 Attachment 7 -- King v. Creed (2015 opinion), # 8 Attachment 8 -- King v. Creed (2016 opinion), # 9 Attachment 9 -- McDermott v. Barton, # 10 Attachment 10 -- Meyer v. Debt Recovery Solutions of Ohio, Inc., # 11 Attachment 11 -- Pickell v. Sands, # 12 Attachment 12 -- Roberts v. State, # 13 Attachment 13 -- Schroeder v. Ryan, # 14 Attachment 14 -- Sherman v. State of Tenn., # 15 Attachment 15 -- State v. Ma)(Campbell, Andrew)
January 19, 2018 Filing 89 RESPONSE to 62 STATEMENT of Undisputed Facts filed by David W. Purkey. (Campbell, Andrew) Modified on 1/22/2018 (dt).
January 19, 2018 Filing 88 REPLY to Response to Motion re 61 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by David W. Purkey. (Campbell, Andrew)
January 12, 2018 Filing 87 REPLY to Response to Motion re 36 MOTION, 6 MOTION to Certify Class filed by David Hixson, James Thomas. (White, Matthew)
December 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER granting 85 Motion Regarding Deadline to File Summary Judgment Reply. Extension to 1/19/18. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 12/28/17. (gb)
December 27, 2017 Filing 85 Joint MOTION Regarding Deadline to File Summary Judgment Reply by David W. Purkey. (Campbell, Andrew)
December 20, 2017 Filing 84 MEMORANDUM in Support of 61 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by David W. Purkey. (dt)
December 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER granting 63 Motion for Permission to Submit Brief in Excess of 25 Pages. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 12/20/17. (dt)
December 19, 2017 Filing 80 CERTIFICATE of Service filed by David Hixson, James Thomas re 74 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages filed by David Hixson, James Thomas, 77 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by David Hixson, James Thomas, 72 MOTION for attorney(s) Jonas Wang to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-2575622) filed by David Hixson, James Thomas, 76 Response in Opposition to Motion filed by David Hixson, James Thomas, 75 Response in Opposition to Motion filed by David Hixson, James Thomas, 73 Certificate of Good Standing filed by David Hixson, James Thomas. (White, Matthew)
December 18, 2017 Filing 82 REPLY to Response to 37 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by David Hixson and James Thomas. (dt)
December 18, 2017 Filing 81 RESPONSE in Opposition to 61 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by David Hixson and James Thomas. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Acts 2011 ch.504)(dt)
December 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER granting 74 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 12/18/17. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
December 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER granting 72 Motion for Jonas Wang to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 12/18/17. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
December 18, 2017 Notice to Filer re DE 72-77: Pursuant to Local Rule 5.01, all filings shall include a Certificate of Service and it shall identify by name the person served, what was served, the method of service, and date of service. Counsel SHALL FILE a conformed Certificate of Service for this document using the Certificate event located under Other Documents. (dt)
December 18, 2017 NY State Bar status verified as active for Jonas Wang. (dt)
December 15, 2017 Filing 77 DECLARATION OF DAVID HIXSON in support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment and in opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment filed by David Hixson, James Thomas. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Reinstatement Letter Dated 11/26/2016)(White, Matthew) Modified on 12/18/2017 (dt).
December 15, 2017 Filing 76 RESPONSE to 62 STATEMENT of Undisputed Facts filed by David Hixson and James Thomas. (White, Matthew) Modified on 12/18/2017 (dt).
December 15, 2017 Filing 75 DECLARATION OF EDWARD P. KRUGMAN in Opposition to 61 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by David Hixson and James Thomas. (White, Matthew) Modified Text on 12/18/2017 (dt).
December 15, 2017 Filing 74 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by David Hixson, James Thomas. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Opposition Brief to Defendant's MSJ, # 2 Exhibit Ex 1 to Ps Opp'n Brief, Acts 2011 ch.504, # 3 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Reply Brief ISO Their MSJ)(White, Matthew)
December 15, 2017 Filing 73 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING of Attorney Jonas Wang from the United States District Court for the Southern of New York filed by David Hixson, James Thomas. (White, Matthew)
December 15, 2017 Filing 72 MOTION for attorney(s) Jonas Wang to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-2575622) by David Hixson, James Thomas. (White, Matthew)
December 4, 2017 Filing 71 NOTICE of Filing by David W. Purkey re 62 Statement of facts,, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit B -- certified copy of Hixson 2013 Washington County conviction, # 2 Exhibit C -- certified copy of Hixson 2015 Washington County conviction, # 3 Exhibit F -- certified copy of Hixson 2003 Sullivan County conviction)(Campbell, Andrew)
November 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER: Plaintiffs' Reply to Defendant Purkey's Response (D.E. 67) to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification to be filed by January 12, 2018. Plaintiffs' Responses to Defendant Purkey's Motion for Summary Judgment and Statement of Undisputed Facts (D.E. 61 and 62) to be filed by December 15, 2017. Plaintiffs' Reply to Defendant Purkey's Response (D.E. 65) to Plaintiffs' Consolidated Response to Defendant Purkey's Motion to Dismiss and Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment to be filed by December 15, 2017.The deadline for Defendant Purkey's Reply to Plaintiffs' Response to his Motion for Summary Judgment will be determined by further Order of the Court, upon appropriate motion by Defendant Purkey or joint motion by the parties. Such motion shall be filed no later than January 5, 2018. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 11/21/17. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
November 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER granting 68 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 11/21/17. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
November 20, 2017 Filing 68 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 61 MOTION for Summary Judgment , 65 Response in Opposition to Motion, 67 Response in Opposition to Motion, 62 Statement of facts,, and for Proposed Briefing Order by David Hixson, James Thomas. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order)(White, Matthew)
November 7, 2017 TN State Bar status verified as active for Alexander Stuart Rieger. (dt)
November 6, 2017 Filing 67 RESPONSE in Opposition re 36 MOTION, 6 MOTION to Certify Class filed by Bill Haslam, David W. Purkey, Herbert Slatery, III. (Rieger, Alexander)
November 6, 2017 Filing 66 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexander Stuart Rieger on behalf of Bill Haslam, David W. Purkey, Herbert Slatery, III (Rieger, Alexander)
November 6, 2017 Filing 65 RESPONSE in Opposition re 37 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by David W. Purkey. (Campbell, Andrew)
November 6, 2017 Filing 64 RESPONSE to 39 STATEMENT of Undisputed Facts filed by David W. Purkey. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 -- Rule 1340-2-5, # 2 Exhibit 2 -- Public Chapter 412)(Campbell, Andrew) Modified on 11/7/2017 (dt).
November 6, 2017 Filing 63 MOTION for Permission to Submit Brief in Excess of 25 Pages re 61 MOTION for Summary Judgment by David W. Purkey. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment Defendant Purkey's Brief in Support of Summary Judgment)(Campbell, Andrew)
November 6, 2017 Filing 62 STATEMENT of Undisputed Facts filed by David W. Purkey in support of 61 Motion for Summary Judgment. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A -- Thomas Criminal Judgment, # 2 Exhibit B -- Hixson 2013 Washington County conviction, # 3 Exhibit C -- Hixson 2015 Washington County conviction, # 4 Exhibit D -- Cortazar Declaration, # 5 Exhibit D-1 -- Notice of Revocation (Thomas), # 6 Exhibit D-2 -- Notice of Revocation (Hixson 2015), # 7 Exhibit D-3 -- Notice of Revocation (Hixson 2017), # 8 Exhibit E -- TBI Sex Offender Registry (Hixson), # 9 Exhibit F -- Hixson 2003 Sullivan County conviction)(Campbell, Andrew) Modified on 11/7/2017 (dt).
November 6, 2017 Filing 61 MOTION for Summary Judgment by David W. Purkey. (Campbell, Andrew)
October 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER granting 59 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Michael Alan Meyer terminated. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 10/17/17. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
October 16, 2017 Filing 59 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Bill Haslam, David W. Purkey, Herbert Slatery, III. (Meyer, Michael)
October 16, 2017 TN State Bar status verified as active for Andrew B. Campbell, Scott C. Sutherland and Katherine Dix. (dt)
October 13, 2017 Filing 58 NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine Dix on behalf of Bill Haslam, David W. Purkey, Herbert Slatery, III (Dix, Katherine)
October 13, 2017 Filing 57 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott C. Sutherland on behalf of Bill Haslam, David W. Purkey, Herbert Slatery, III (Sutherland, Scott)
October 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER granting 53 Motion to Set Revised Briefing Schedule. Extensions as requested. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 10/10/17. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
October 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 55 JOINT STIPULATION AND AGREED ORDER: As demonstrated by the signatures of adversary counsel below, and pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), Fed. R. Civ. P., official-capacity Defendants Haslam and Slatery are hereby dismissed without prejudice. Bill Haslam (Governor of Tennessee, in his official capacity) and Herbert Slatery, III (Attorney General and Reporter, in his official capacity) terminated. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 10/10/17. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
October 9, 2017 Filing 54 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Defendants Haslam and Slatery without Prejudice and Agreed Order by Bill Haslam, David W. Purkey, Herbert Slatery, III. (Campbell, Andrew)
October 9, 2017 Filing 53 Joint MOTION to Set Revised Briefing Schedule by Bill Haslam, David W. Purkey, Herbert Slatery, III. (Campbell, Andrew)
October 6, 2017 Filing 52 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew B. Campbell on behalf of Bill Haslam, David W. Purkey, Herbert Slatery, III (Campbell, Andrew)
September 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER: The plaintiffs have filed a Renewed Motion for Class Certification (Docket No. 36). It is therefore ORDERED that the Motion for Class Certification filed on January 5, 2017 (Docket No. 6) shall be TERMED by the Clerk. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 9/29/2017. (ds)
September 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER denying as moot 47 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 9/19/2017. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(hb)
September 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER granting 48 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 6 MOTION to Certify Class and 37 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Replies due by 10/18/2017.Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 9/19/2017. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(hb)
September 18, 2017 Filing 48 Amended MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiffs' Motions for Class Certification and Summary Judgment by Bill Haslam, David W. Purkey, Herbert Slatery, III. (Meyer, Michael)
September 18, 2017 Filing 47 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiffs' Motions for Class Certification and Summary Judgment by Bill Haslam, David W. Purkey, Herbert Slatery, III. (Meyer, Michael)
August 23, 2017 NY State Bar status verified as active for Edward P. Krugman. DC State Bar status verified as active for Premal Dharia. (dt)
August 22, 2017 Filing 46 CERTIFICATE of service filed by David Hixson, James Thomas re 36 MOTION filed by David Hixson, James Thomas, 42 Declaration filed by David Hixson, James Thomas, 41 Declaration filed by David Hixson, James Thomas, 37 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by David Hixson, James Thomas, 40 Stipulation filed by David Hixson, James Thomas, 35 MOTION for attorney(s) Premal Dharia to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-2503004) filed by David Hixson, James Thomas, 34 MOTION for attorney(s) Edward P. Krugman to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-2502992) filed by David Hixson, James Thomas, 38 Memorandum in Support, filed by David Hixson, James Thomas, 43 Declaration filed by David Hixson, James Thomas, 39 Statement of facts, filed by David Hixson, James Thomas. (White, Matthew)
August 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER granting 35 Motion for Premal Dharia to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 8/21/17. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
August 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER granting 34 Motion for Edward P. Krugman to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 8/21/17. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
August 21, 2017 Note to Filer re DE#34-43: Pursuant to Local Rule 5.01, Certificates of Service shall identify by name the person served, what was served, the method of service, and date of service. Please FILE a conformed Certificate of Service for these documents. (dt)
August 18, 2017 Filing 43 DECLARATION of Edward P. Krugman filed by David Hixson, James Thomas re: 37 MOTION for Summary Judgment . (White, Matthew)
August 18, 2017 Filing 42 DECLARATION of James Thomas filed by David Hixson, James Thomas re: 37 MOTION for Summary Judgment . (White, Matthew)
August 18, 2017 Filing 41 DECLARATION of David Hixson filed by David Hixson, James Thomas re: 37 MOTION for Summary Judgment . (White, Matthew)
August 18, 2017 Filing 40 STIPULATION re 37 MOTION for Summary Judgment Factual Stipulations Between the Parties by David Hixson, James Thomas. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Effect of Amendment)(White, Matthew)
August 18, 2017 Filing 39 STATEMENT of facts as to which there is no genuine dispute filed by David Hixson, James Thomas in support of 37 Motion for Summary Judgment. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit AG Opinion 06-135, # 2 Exhibit Email Corr., # 3 Exhibit Transit and Jobs Report, # 4 Exhibit Tenn. Resident Data Table 2, # 5 Exhibit Pivot Table)(White, Matthew)
August 18, 2017 Filing 38 MEMORANDUM in Support of 37 MOTION for Summary Judgment , 23 MOTION to Dismiss and to Defer Issues Related to Class Certification filed by David Hixson, James Thomas Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment and in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss. (White, Matthew)
August 18, 2017 Filing 37 MOTION for Summary Judgment by David Hixson, James Thomas. (White, Matthew)
August 18, 2017 Filing 36 NOTICE OF RENEWED MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION by David Hixson and James Thomas re 6 MOTION to Certify Class . (White, Matthew) Modified on 8/21/2017 (dt).
August 18, 2017 Filing 35 MOTION for attorney(s) Premal Dharia to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-2503004) by David Hixson, James Thomas. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(White, Matthew)
August 18, 2017 Filing 34 MOTION for attorney(s) Edward P. Krugman to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-2502992) by David Hixson, James Thomas. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(White, Matthew)
August 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER Granting Joint Motion to Set Briefing Schedule: The following deadline shall govern this matter: August 18, 2017 is the deadline for Plaintiffs to file both their Response to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss as well as Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment, in one single brief with a 40-page limit. August 18, 2017 is the deadline for Plaintiffs to file a Renewed Motion for Class Certification. September 18, 2017 is the deadline for Defendants to file their Reply to Plaintiffs' Response to Motion to Dismiss and their Responses to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment and Renewed Motion for Class Certification. October 3, 2017 is the deadline for the filing of Plaintiffs' Replies to Defendants' Responses noted above. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 8/8/2017. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
July 26, 2017 Filing 32 JOINT MOTION to set Briefing Schedule for Responses and Replies, and for Hearing on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment by David Hixson, James Thomas. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order)(White, Matthew) Modified on 7/27/2017 (dt).
July 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting 30 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to 23 MOTION to Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 7/5/17. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
July 3, 2017 Filing 30 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to 23 MOTION to Dismiss and to Defer Issues Related to Class Certification by David Hixson, James Thomas. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order)(White, Matthew) Modified on 7/5/2017 (dt).
May 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting 28 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re 23 MOTION to Dismiss and to Defer Issues Related to Class Certification. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 5/12/2017. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(hb)
May 10, 2017 Filing 28 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 23 MOTION to Dismiss and to Defer Issues Related to Class Certification by David Hixson, James Thomas. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Order)(White, Matthew)
March 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER: The Joint Motion to Extend Plaintiffs' Deadline to File a Response to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Docket No. 26 ) is GRANTED. The deadline for the filing of a response to the pending Motion to Dismiss is hereby extended until May 19, 2017. It is further ORDERED that the initial case management conference scheduled for April 17, 2017 is CONTINUED, to be reset, if appropriate, after disposition of this motion. It is so ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 3/15/2017. (hb)
March 14, 2017 Filing 26 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 23 MOTION to Dismiss and to Defer Issues Related to Class Certification by David Hixson, James Thomas. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Order)(White, Matthew)
March 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the Motion to Certify Class filed by the plaintiffs on January 5, 2017 (Docket No. 6 ) shall be held in abeyance, pending a decision on the Motion to Dismiss filed March 3, 2017 (Docket No. 23 ). It is so ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 3/6/2017. (hb)
March 6, 2017 TN State Bar status verified as active for Michael Alan Meyer. (hb)
March 3, 2017 Filing 24 MEMORANDUM in Support of 23 MOTION to Dismiss and to Defer Issues Related to Class Certification filed by Bill Haslam, David W. Purkey, Herbert Slatery, III . (Meyer, Michael)
March 3, 2017 Filing 23 MOTION to Dismiss and to Defer Issues Related to Class Certification by Bill Haslam, David W. Purkey, Herbert Slatery, III. (Meyer, Michael)
March 3, 2017 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Alan Meyer on behalf of All Defendants (Meyer, Michael)
February 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting 18 Motion for Charles Gerstein to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 2/7/2017. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(hb)
February 6, 2017 Filing 20 RECEIPT #34675044558 in the amount of $75 re 18 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (hb)
February 6, 2017 $75 PHV fee rec'd this date for atty Charles Gerstein re DE 18 . (af)
January 27, 2017 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING of Attorney Charles Gerstein from the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York filed by David Hixson, James Thomas. (hb)
January 27, 2017 Filing 18 MOTION for attorney Charles Gerstein to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Fee paid) by David Hixson, James Thomas. (hb) Modified on 2/7/2017 (af).
January 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting 5 Motion for Josh Spickler to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 1/6/2017. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(hb)
January 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting 4 Motion for Francisca D. Fajana to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 1/6/2017. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(hb)
January 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting 3 Motion for Petra T. Tasheff to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 1/6/2017. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(hb)
January 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting 2 Motion for Claudia Wilner to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 1/6/2017. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(hb)
January 5, 2017 Filing 13 SUMMONS returned executed by James Thomas, David Hixson. David W. Purkey served on 1/5/2017. (White, Matthew)
January 5, 2017 Filing 12 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/17/2017 at 01:00 PM in Chambers 825 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. (hb)
January 5, 2017 Filing 11 SUMMONS returned executed by James Thomas, David Hixson. Herbert Slatery, III served on 1/5/2017. (White, Matthew)
January 5, 2017 Filing 10 SUMMONS returned executed by James Thomas, David Hixson. Bill Haslam served on 1/5/2017. (White, Matthew)
January 5, 2017 TN State Bar status verified as active for Lori H. Patterson, Matthew G. White, Josh Spickler, NY State Bar status verified as active for Claudia Wilner, Petra T. Tasheff, MA State Bar status verified as active for Francisca Fajana, and DC State Bar status verified as active for Charles Gerstein. (hb)
January 5, 2017 Filing 9 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (hb)
January 5, 2017 Filing 8 Summons issued as to Bill Haslam, David W. Purkey, Herbert Slatery, III. (hb)
January 5, 2017 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM in Support of 6 MOTION to Certify Class filed by David Hixson, James Thomas . (White, Matthew)
January 5, 2017 Filing 6 MOTION to Certify Class by David Hixson, James Thomas. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment Declaration of James Thomas, # 2 Attachment Declaration of David Hixson, # 3 Attachment Attorney Declaration of Claudia Wilner)(White, Matthew)
January 5, 2017 Filing 5 MOTION for attorney(s) Josh Spickler to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-2352982) by David Hixson, James Thomas. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(White, Matthew)
January 5, 2017 Filing 4 MOTION for attorney(s) Francisca D. Fajana to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-2352978) by David Hixson, James Thomas. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(White, Matthew)
January 5, 2017 Filing 3 MOTION for attorney(s) Petra T. Tasheff to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-2352973) by David Hixson, James Thomas. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(White, Matthew)
January 5, 2017 Filing 2 MOTION for attorney(s) Claudia Wilner to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-2352967) by David Hixson, James Thomas. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(White, Matthew)
January 4, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bill Haslam, David W. Purkey, Herbert Slatery, III (Filing fee PAID $400, Receipt number 0650-2352164), filed by James Thomas, David Hixson. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet)(hb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thomas et al v. Haslam et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Thomas
Represented By: Francisca Fajana
Represented By: Charles Gerstein
Represented By: Lori H. Patterson
Represented By: Josh Spickler
Represented By: Petra T. Tasheff
Represented By: Matthew G. White
Represented By: Claudia Wilner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Hixson
Represented By: Francisca Fajana
Represented By: Charles Gerstein
Represented By: Lori H. Patterson
Represented By: Josh Spickler
Represented By: Petra T. Tasheff
Represented By: Matthew G. White
Represented By: Claudia Wilner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bill Haslam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David W. Purkey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Herbert Slatery, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?