Nelson v. Brown et al
Plaintiff: Charles D. Nelson
Defendant: (f/n/u) Brown and (f/n/u) Morse
Case Number: 3:2017cv00792
Filed: May 3, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Office: Nashville Office
County: Davidson
Presiding Judge: Aleta A. Trauger
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 61 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: The Court has reviewed the R&R, and the file. For the aforementioned reasons, the Court ADOPTS and APPROVES the R&R (Doc. No. 57).4 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. No. 44) is hereby GRANTED. The Cle rk is directed to close this file. This Order shall constitute the judgment in this case for purposes of Fed. R. Civ. P. 58. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 6/3/2020. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail. ) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am)
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 57 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 44 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by (f/n/u) Brown, (f/n/u) Morse. For these reasons, the Magistrate Judge RECOMMENDS that the Court GRANT Defendants Morse and Brown's motion for summary judgment (Doc. No. 44) and enter judgment in their favor. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 1/9/2020. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail. ) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am)
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 42 MEMORANDUM ORDER: For the reasons that follow, Defendants' motion for summary judgment (Doc. No. 25) will be ADMINISTRATIVELY TERMINATED WITHOUT PREJUDICE to refiling; Nelson's motion to compel (Doc. No. 34) will be FOUND MOOT IN PART AN D DENIED IN PART; Nelson's motion to appoint counsel (Doc. No. 40) will be DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE; and Nelson's motion to add other defendants (Doc. No. 41) will be DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 3/19/19. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail. ) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am)
September 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MEMORANDUM signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 9/5/2017. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail. ) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(ab)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nelson v. Brown et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles D. Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: (f/n/u) Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: (f/n/u) Morse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?