Payne v. Genovese et al
Plaintiff: |
Larry Payne |
Defendant: |
Kevin Genovese, Jason Clendenion Oates, Stacey Oates and Rita Edwards |
Case Number: |
3:2017cv01410 |
Filed: |
October 27, 2017 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee |
Office: |
Nashville Office |
County: |
Davidson |
Presiding Judge: |
Alistair Newbern |
Presiding Judge: |
Waverly D. Crenshaw |
Nature of Suit: |
Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
January 16, 2020 |
Filing
120
ORDER: The R&R (Doc. No. 116) is APPROVED AND ADOPTED, and Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (Doc. No. 107) is DENIED. This case is hereby RETURNED to the Magistrate Judge for further case management. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 1/16/20. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail. ) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(vh)
|
March 25, 2019 |
Filing
97
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Doc. No. 56 ) is GRANTED IN PART as to Payne's claims (1) for monetary damages against the Defendants in their official capacities; (2) that Genovese was deliberately indiffer ent to his medical needs by failing to provide him with physical therapy; and (3) that Oakes retaliated against him by transferring him to the High Security Annex in retaliation for having filed grievances. The Defendants' motion is DENIED IN PART as to Payne's claim that Clendenion was deliberately indifferent to Payne's medical needs by failing to transfer him to a flat-land facility. That claim and the other unchallenged claims made in Payne's Amended Complaint will proceed. This case is RETURNED to the Magistrate Judge for further case management. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 3/25/2019. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail.) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(jm)
|
August 13, 2018 |
Filing
54
ORDER: Report and Recommendations 53 is Adopted. Plaintiff's Motion for a Preliminary Injunction and for a Temporary Restraining Order 2 is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 8/13/18. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail.) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?