Everly v. Everly et al
Plaintiff: Isaac Donald Everly
Defendant: Patrice Y. Everly, Phillip J. Everly, Christopher Everly, The Phillip Everly Family Trust and Everly and Sons Music (BMI)
Counter_plaintiff: Everly and Sons Music (BMI), Christopher Everly, Patrice Y. Everly, The Phillip Everly Family Trust and Phillip J. Everly
Counter_defendant: Isaac Donald Everly
Case Number: 3:2017cv01440
Filed: November 8, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Office: Nashville Office
County: Davidson
Presiding Judge: Aleta A. Trauger
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17:0101
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 80 MEMORANDUM OPINION OF THE COURT. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 9/22/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(mg)
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 65 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: Before the court is a question regarding the scope of the Sixth Circuit's remand. The court construes the defendants' recently filed Brief (Doc. No. 63 ) on that issue as a motion for clarification as to the scope o f remand as well as motion for leave to amend both the operative scheduling order and the defendants' Answer. The defendants' request for a clarification of the scope of the proceedings on remand is GRANTED, as follows: the remand was gene ral, and the defendants cannot be deemed to have waived the arguments raised in their Rule 59 motion. The defendants' implicit request to amend the ICMO to extend the deadline for amending pleadings and their request to amend their Answer to add a statute-of-limitations defense based on the 1972 David Frost show are DENIED for the reasons stated herein. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 7/22/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(vh)
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 53 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: For the reasons set forth herein, the plaintiff is AWARDED his costs in the amount of $6,706.66, as set forth in the Bill of Costs, pursuant to Rule 54(d)(1). The original Motion for Attorneys' Fees (Doc. No. 33 ) is DENIED AS MOOT. The Amended Motion (Doc. No. 44 ), seeking attorneys fees and litigation expenses in excess of those enumerated in the Bill of Costs, is DENIED. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 4/3/2019. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (jm)
November 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MEMORANDUM OPINION OF THE COURT: Before the court is the Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. No. 19 ), filed by plaintiff Isaac Donald Everly, to which the defendants have filed a Response (Doc. No. 22 ), and the plaintiff has filed a Reply (Doc. No. 24 ). For the reasons stated herein, the court will grant the motion. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 11/6/2018. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(jm)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Everly v. Everly et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Isaac Donald Everly
Represented By: Linda Frances Howard
Represented By: Philip Michael Kirkpatrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrice Y. Everly
Represented By: Jay Scott Bowen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phillip J. Everly
Represented By: Jay Scott Bowen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Everly
Represented By: Jay Scott Bowen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Phillip Everly Family Trust
Represented By: Jay Scott Bowen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Everly and Sons Music (BMI)
Represented By: Jay Scott Bowen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_plaintiff: Everly and Sons Music (BMI)
Represented By: Jay Scott Bowen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_plaintiff: Christopher Everly
Represented By: Jay Scott Bowen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_plaintiff: Patrice Y. Everly
Represented By: Jay Scott Bowen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_plaintiff: The Phillip Everly Family Trust
Represented By: Jay Scott Bowen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_plaintiff: Phillip J. Everly
Represented By: Jay Scott Bowen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Isaac Donald Everly
Represented By: Linda Frances Howard
Represented By: Philip Michael Kirkpatrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?