Johnson v. ATG Credit, LLC

Plaintiff: Paula Johnson
Defendant: ATG Credit, LLC
Case Number: 3:2018cv00586
Filed: June 26, 2018
Court: Tennessee Middle District Court
Office: Nashville Office
County: Davidson
Presiding Judge: Aleta A Trauger
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 24, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
August 24, 2018 7 Featured Case ORDER: Given the Application for entry of default filed in this case (Docket No. 6), it is hereby ORDERED that the Initial Case Management Conference set for Monday, August 27, 2018 is continued. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 8/24/2018. (jw)
August 23, 2018 6 MOTION for Default Judgment as to by Paula Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Postage Receipt)(Kaludis, William)
June 27, 2018 5 Summons issued as to ATG Credit, LLC. (Service packets mailed to Attorney.) (am)
June 27, 2018 4 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/27/2018 at 02:45 PM in Chambers 825 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. (am)
June 27, 2018 TN State Bar status verified as active for William M. Kaludis. (am)
June 27, 2018 3 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (am)
June 27, 2018 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (am)
June 26, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against ATG Credit, LLC (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-2697627), filed by Paula Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(am)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. ATG Credit, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paula Johnson
Represented By: William M. Kaludis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ATG Credit, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?