Bricka-Wallace v. Boston Scientific Corporation
Plaintiff: Billie Bricka-Wallace
Defendant: Boston Scientific Corporation
Case Number: 3:2018cv00647
Filed: July 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Office: Nashville Office
County: Davidson
Presiding Judge: William L Campbell
Referring Judge: Barbara D Holmes
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 6, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: On September 6, 2018, counsel for Plaintiff telephoned the Court to advise that a settlement has been reached in this case, and the parties are in the process of finalizing the settlement, and that should be accomplished within two weeks. Therefore, an agreed order or stipulation of dismissal shall be filed no later than September 24, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 9/6/2018. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(mg)
August 7, 2018 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, First Amended Complaint and Notice of Setting of Initial Case Management Conference served on Boston Scientific Corporation on August 6, 2018, filed by Billie Bricka-Wallace. (Flynn, Charles)
August 3, 2018 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Boston Scientific Corporation, filed by Billie Bricka-Wallace.(Flynn, Charles)
July 20, 2018 COPY OF TEXT ORDER FROM MDL JUDICIAL PANEL: ***TEXT ONLY ORDER*** MINUTE ORDER SUSPENDING RULE 7.1(a) -- Panel Rule 7.1(a), requiring notification to the Clerk of the Panel of potential tag-along actions, is hereby suspended in this litigation until further notice. Signed by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi on 6/20/2018. Associated Cases: MDL No. 2326 et al. (dld) . (af) (Entered: 07/20/2018)
July 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 7/19/2018. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(jw)
July 19, 2018 Copy of complaint & docket sheet emailed to MDL Clerk of Court as related to MDL 2326 IN RE: Boston Scientific Corp. Pelvic Repair System Products Liability Litigation. (af)
July 18, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/11/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 764 before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes. (jw)
July 18, 2018 Filing 4 Summons issued as to Boston Scientific Corporation. Service copies returned to counsel by mail. (jw)
July 18, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (jw)
July 18, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (jw)
July 18, 2018 TN State Bar status verified as active for Charles A. Flynn. (jw)
July 13, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Boston Scientific Corporation (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-2709433), filed by Billie Bricka-Wallace. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bricka-Wallace v. Boston Scientific Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boston Scientific Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Billie Bricka-Wallace
Represented By: Charles A. Flynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?