Servpro Industries, Inc. v. Harinder S. Toor Construction, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Servpro Industries, Inc.
Defendant: Harinder S. Toor, Kamaljot Gill and Harinder S. Toor Construction, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018cv00663
Filed: July 17, 2018
Court: Tennessee Middle District Court
Office: Nashville Office
County: Sumner
Presiding Judge: Aleta A Trauger
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
September 14, 2018 17 Featured Case ORDER granting #16 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Kamaljot Gill answer due 10/8/2018; Harinder S. Toor Construction, Inc. answer due 10/8/2018; Harinder S. Toor answer due 10/8/2018. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 9/14/2018. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am)
September 13, 2018 16 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer AND TO POSTPONE INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE by Servpro Industries, Inc.. (Harvey, Robb)
August 15, 2018 15 Featured Case AGREED ORDER: The parties have filed a Joint Motion to Extend the Time for Filing Answer or Other Response. Based on the Joint Motion and for good cause shown, the Court extends the time for Defendants Harinder S. Toor Construction, Inc., doing business as Servpro of Turlock, Harinder S. Toor, and Kamaljot Gill until and including September 10, 2018. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 8/15/2018. (mg)
August 15, 2018 14 Featured Case ORDER: Motion #13 is GRANTED for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, answer due 9/10/2018. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 8/15/2018. (mg)
August 14, 2018 13 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Other Response by Kamaljot Gill, Harinder S. Toor Construction, Inc., Harinder S. Toor. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Agreed Order)(Craft, Perry)
August 13, 2018 TN State Bar status verified as active for Perry A. Craft. (mg)
August 10, 2018 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Perry A. Craft on behalf of All Defendants (Craft, Perry)
August 2, 2018 11 SUMMONS returned executed by Servpro Industries, Inc.. Kamaljot Gill served on 7/25/2018. (Harvey, Robb)
August 2, 2018 10 SUMMONS returned executed by Servpro Industries, Inc.. Harinder S. Toor served on 7/25/2018. (Harvey, Robb)
August 2, 2018 9 ***DISREGARD, COUNSEL REFILED USING CORRECT EVENT, SEE D/E#11 *** Summons Returned Unexecuted by Servpro Industries, Inc. as to Kamaljot Gill. (Harvey, Robb) Modified text on 8/3/2018 (mg).
August 2, 2018 8 ***DISREGARD, COUNSEL REFILED USING CORRECT EVENT, SEE D/E#10 *** Summons Returned Unexecuted by Servpro Industries, Inc. as to Harinder S. Toor. (Harvey, Robb) Modified text on 8/3/2018 (mg).
July 18, 2018 7 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/17/2018 at 1:45 PM in Chambers 825 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. (mg)
July 18, 2018 District Judge Aleta A. Trauger added. Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr no longer assigned to case due to conflict. (af)
July 18, 2018 6 ***CANCELLED***NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/17/2018 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 661 before Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley. (mg) Modified text on 7/18/2018 (mg). Modified text on 7/19/2018 (mg).
July 18, 2018 TN State Bar status verified as active for Robb S. Harvey, and Kevin T. Elkins. (mg)
July 18, 2018 5 Summons issued as to Kamaljot Gill, Harinder S. Toor Construction, Inc., and Harinder S. Toor. Service copies will be picked up by counsel. (mg) Modified text on 7/18/2018 (mg).
July 18, 2018 4 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (mg)
July 18, 2018 3 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (mg)
July 17, 2018 2 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Servpro Industries, Inc. (mg)
July 17, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against Kamaljot Gill, Harinder S. Toor Construction, Inc., Harinder S. Toor (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-2711567), filed by Servpro Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Franchise License Agreement and Assignment of Franchise, #3 Exhibit B - Personal Responsibility Statement, #4 Exhibit C - Guaranty Agreement)(mg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Servpro Industries, Inc. v. Harinder S. Toor Construction, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harinder S. Toor
Represented By: Perry A. Craft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kamaljot Gill
Represented By: Perry A. Craft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harinder S. Toor Construction, Inc.
Represented By: Perry A. Craft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Servpro Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Robb S. Harvey
Represented By: Kevin T. Elkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?