Shannon v. The Duke Apartments of Nashville, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Leann Shannon
Defendant: The Giddings Group, LLC and The Duke Apartments of Nashville, LLC
Case Number: 3:2018cv00697
Filed: July 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Office: Nashville Office
County: Davidson
0 Judge: Waverly D Crenshaw
1 Judge: Barbara D Holmes
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42:3601
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 19, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2018 Filing 15 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER filed by Leann Shannon. (Calhoun, Eric)
September 18, 2018 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by The Duke Apartments of Nashville, LLC.(McFall, Alex)
September 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #10 unopposed motion of Defendant The Duke Apartments of Nashville, LLC for extension of time to answer or otherwise respond to complaint #1 . Defendant The Duke Apartments must answer or otherwise respond to the complaint by NO LATER THAN SEPTEMBER 18, 2018. (Defendant is also reminded that a motion to which there is no opposition should be filed as an unopposed motion, not as a joint motion, since designation as a joint motion suggests that more than one party is presenting the motion.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 09/11/2018. (BH)
August 29, 2018 TN State Bar status verified as active for Alex McFall and Brent R. Laman. (jw)
August 28, 2018 Filing 12 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by The Giddings Group, LLC. (Laman, Brent)
August 28, 2018 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by The Giddings Group, LLC.(Laman, Brent)
August 28, 2018 Filing 10 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by The Duke Apartments of Nashville, LLC. (McFall, Alex)
August 28, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Alex McFall on behalf of The Duke Apartments of Nashville, LLC (McFall, Alex)
August 7, 2018 TX State Bar status verified as active for Eric G. Calhoun. (jw)
August 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Eric G. Calhoun to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 8/6/2018. (jw)
August 6, 2018 Filing 7 First MOTION for attorney(s) Eric G. Calhoun to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-2725206) by Leann Shannon. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Todd, Henry)
July 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 7/31/2018. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(jw)
July 27, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/25/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 764 before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes. (jw)
July 27, 2018 Filing 4 Summons issued as to The Duke Apartments of Nashville, LLC and The Giddings Group, LLC. Service copies returned to counsel by mail. (jw)
July 27, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (jw)
July 27, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (jw)
July 27, 2018 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Eric G. Calhoun: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, a Certificate of Good Standing signed by the Clerk of a United States District Court where admitted, and pay a fee of $100.00 (LR 83.01(d)). PHV due by 8/17/2018. (jw)
July 27, 2018 TX State Bar status verified as active for Eric G. Calhoun, and TN Henry Franklin Todd, Jr. (jw)
July 27, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against The Duke Apartments of Nashville, LLC, The Giddings Group, LLC (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-2718716), filed by Leann Shannon. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shannon v. The Duke Apartments of Nashville, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Giddings Group, LLC
Represented By: Brent R. Laman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Duke Apartments of Nashville, LLC
Represented By: Alex McFall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leann Shannon
Represented By: Eric G. Calhoun
Represented By: Henry Franklin Todd, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?