U.S. Bancorp v. Park Hotels & Resorts, Inc.
Plaintiff: U.S. Bancorp
Defendant: Park Hotels & Resorts, Inc. and Apple Nine Hospitality Ownership, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018cv00706
Filed: July 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Office: Nashville Office
County: Davidson
Presiding Judge: Waverly D Crenshaw
Referring Judge: Jeffery S Frensley
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2018 TN State Bar status verified as active for Michael K. Radford. (mg)
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: Motion #12 granted. The Initial Case Mgt Conference is reset to October 11, 2018, at 2:30 pm. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 9/24/2018. (mg)
September 23, 2018 Filing 12 Joint MOTION to Continue foe Resetting of Initial Case Management Conference by U.S. Bancorp. (Piovarcy, Lee)
September 21, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael K. Radford on behalf of Apple Nine Hospitality Ownership, Inc. (Radford, Michael)
September 20, 2018 Filing 10 SUMMONS returned executed by U.S. Bancorp. Apple Nine Hospitality Ownership, Inc. served on 9/14/2018. (Piovarcy, Lee)
September 10, 2018 Filing 9 Summons issued as to Apple Nine Hospitality Ownership, Inc. Service copies will be returned to counsel by mail. (mg)
September 4, 2018 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Apple Nine Hospitality Ownership, Inc., filed by U.S. Bancorp.(Piovarcy, Lee)
August 2, 2018 Filing 7 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by U.S. Bancorp. (Piovarcy, Lee)
July 31, 2018 Filing 6 Summons issued as to Park Hotels & Resorts, Inc. (Attorney to pick up service packets at the front counter). (am)
July 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01. Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 7/31/2018. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am)
July 31, 2018 TN State Bar status verified as active for Lee L. Piovarcy, Andrew Gardella. (am)
July 31, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/1/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 661 before Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley. (am)
July 31, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (am)
July 31, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (am)
July 30, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Park Hotels & Resorts, Inc. (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-2720597), filed by U.S. Bancorp. (afs) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/30/2018: #1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet) (afs).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: U.S. Bancorp v. Park Hotels & Resorts, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.S. Bancorp
Represented By: Lee L. Piovarcy
Represented By: Andrew Gardella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Park Hotels & Resorts, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Nine Hospitality Ownership, Inc.
Represented By: Michael K. Radford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?